EP2563128 - METHODS OF CONTROLLING NEONICOTINOID RESISTANT APHIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2014 [2014/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Syngenta Participations AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLATER, Russell Syngenta Crop Protection Münchwilen AG Schaffhauserstrasse 4332 Stein / CH | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Syngenta International AG WRO 1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldalle 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/44] | Arunasalam, Velautha-Cumaran, et al Syngenta International AG Intellectual Property WRO-1004-6-22 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2013/10] | Jantschy, Jasmin Syngenta International AG Intellectual Property Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11714987.2 | 18.04.2011 | WO2011EP56120 | Priority number, date | EP20100161121 | 27.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10161121 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134817 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563128 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/54 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A01N43/54 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/54, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON NEONICOTINOID-RESISTENTEN BLATTLÄUSEN | [2013/10] | English: | METHODS OF CONTROLLING NEONICOTINOID RESISTANT APHIDS | [2013/10] | French: | MÉTHODES DE MAÎTRISE DE PUCERONS RÉSISTANTS AUX NÉONICOTINOÏDES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2014 | Observations by third parties | 18.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/29] | 12.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2013 | 30.04.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1097932 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0113]; example -; claim -; table - *; | [Y]WO2007123855 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * page 80, line 8 - line 24 * * page 81, line 20 - line 38 * * page 82, line 30; example -; claim - *; | [YD]EP2008521 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]) [YD] 1-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005]; example -; claim - *; | [YP]WO2010083955 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [YP] 1-16* page 16, line 11; example -; claim - *; | [Y] - R. NAUEN AND I. DENHOLM, "Resistance of Insect Pests to Neonicotinoid Insecticides", ARCHIVES OF INSECT BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 58, pages 200 - 215, XP009150173 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 201 - page 204 * | by applicant | EP1097932 | WO2009000470 | - NAUEN, DENHOLM, ARCHIVES OF INSECT BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, (2005), vol. 58, pages 200 - 215 | - YAMAMOTO, AGROCHEM JPN, (1996), vol. 68, pages 14 - 15 | other | - CASTLE S; PALUMBO J; PRABHAKER N, "NEWER INSECTICIDES FOR PLANT VIRUS DISEASE MANAGEMENT", VIRUS RESEARCH, (20090501), vol. 141, no. 2, pages 131 - 139, XP026035055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2008.12.006 | - M.E. WHALON ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF GLOBAL PESTICIDE RESISTANCE IN ARTHROPODS", M.E. WHALON ET AL, M.E. WHALON ET AL, GLOBAL PESTICIDE RESISTANCE IN ARTHROPODS, CAB INTERNATIONAL, (2008), pages 5 - 31, ISBN 978 1 84593 353 1, XP003033459 |