EP2547958 - WALL CONSTRUCTION FOR A BOILER ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Foster Wheeler North America Corp. 53 Frontage Road P.O. Box 9000 Hampton, NJ 08827-9000 / US | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Arthur 8 Alexandria Drive East Hanover New Jersey 07936 / US | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Salonen, Kauko Tuomas Genip Oy P.O. Box 201 78201 Varkaus / FI | [2013/04] | Application number, filing date | 11715036.7 | 16.03.2011 | WO2011IB51099 | Priority number, date | US20100726406 | 18.03.2010 Original published format: US 726406 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011114297 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2547958 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F23C10/10 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
F23C10/10 (EP,KR,US);
F23C10/18 (EP,KR,US);
F23C2206/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | WANDKONSTRUKTION FÜR EINE HEISSWASSERBEREITERANORDNUNG | [2013/04] | English: | WALL CONSTRUCTION FOR A BOILER ARRANGEMENT | [2013/04] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE PAROIS POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE CHAUDIÈRE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 19.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.03.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9323703 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 13, line 15 - page 18, line 17; figures 1-7 *; | [XY]WO9411674 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [X] 1,16 * figure 1 * [Y] 12-15,27-29; | [YA]WO9411671 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [Y] 12-15,27-29 * the whole document *[A] 1,16; | [Y]WO9739282 (ABB CARBON AB [SE], et al) [Y] 12-15,27-29 * abstract * |