EP2558844 - ACOUSTIC WAVE IMAGING APPARATUS AND ACOUSTIC WAVE IMAGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/48] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YODA, Haruo c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
NAGAE, Kenichi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2018/48] |
Former [2013/08] | 01 /
YODA, Haruo c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAE, Kenichi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2018/48] |
Former [2013/08] | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 DE-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11715062.3 | 28.03.2011 | [2018/48] | WO2011JP01823 | Priority number, date | JP20100091290 | 12.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010091290 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011129061 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2558844 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2558844 | Date: | 28.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/17, G01N29/24, G01S7/52, G01N29/06 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
G01N21/1702 (EP,US);
G01N29/0654 (EP,US);
G01N29/2418 (EP,US);
G01S7/52046 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/106 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | G01N21/17, G01N29/24, A61B5/00, A61B8/14, G10K11/34, G01S7/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLWELLENABBILDUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SCHALLWELLENABBILDUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/08] | English: | ACOUSTIC WAVE IMAGING APPARATUS AND ACOUSTIC WAVE IMAGING METHOD | [2013/08] | French: | APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE PAR ONDES ACOUSTIQUES ET MÉTHODE D'IMAGERIE PAR ONDES ACOUSTIQUES | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 21.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2011 | AL | 28.11.2018 | AT | 28.11.2018 | CY | 28.11.2018 | CZ | 28.11.2018 | DK | 28.11.2018 | EE | 28.11.2018 | ES | 28.11.2018 | FI | 28.11.2018 | HR | 28.11.2018 | IT | 28.11.2018 | LT | 28.11.2018 | LV | 28.11.2018 | MC | 28.11.2018 | MK | 28.11.2018 | NL | 28.11.2018 | PL | 28.11.2018 | RO | 28.11.2018 | RS | 28.11.2018 | SE | 28.11.2018 | SI | 28.11.2018 | SK | 28.11.2018 | SM | 28.11.2018 | TR | 28.11.2018 | BG | 28.02.2019 | NO | 28.02.2019 | GR | 01.03.2019 | GB | 28.03.2019 | IE | 28.03.2019 | IS | 28.03.2019 | LU | 28.03.2019 | MT | 28.03.2019 | PT | 28.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
AL | 28.11.2018 | ||
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CY | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
MT | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
TR | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
GB | 28.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SI | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
MC | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SK | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
EE | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RO | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
SM | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
PL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
DK | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
IT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
NL | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.11.2018 | |
AT | 28.11.2018 | ||
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
PT | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
RS | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
SE | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
GR | 01.03.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 28.11.2018 | |
ES | 28.11.2018 | ||
FI | 28.11.2018 | ||
HR | 28.11.2018 | ||
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
LV | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2019 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 28.11.2018 | |
LT | 28.11.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 28.11.2018 | |
NO | 28.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003065262 (STERGIOPOULOS STERGIOS [CA], et al) [X] 1,4,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0022] , [0023] , [0034] - [0039] - [0072] - [0114] - [0131] , [0132] , [0144]; figures 1,2,5,10,14 * [I] 2,3,5,6; | [A]US2003204142 (BROCK-FISHER GEORGE A [US], et al) [A] 5,6,8* paragraphs [0036] - [0054]; figures 1,2 *; | [AD] - J-F SYNNEVAG ET AL, "Adaptive Beamforming Applied to Medical Ultrasound Imaging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (20070801), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1109/TUFFC.2007.431, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 1606 - 1613, XP011190325 [AD] 1,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2007.431 | [A] - J-F SYNNEVAG ET AL, "Benefits of minimum-variance beamforming in medical ultrasound imaging", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, IEEE, US, (20090901), vol. 56, no. 9, doi:DOI:10.1109/TUFFC.2009.1263, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 1868 - 1879, XP011283394 [A] 1,8,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2009.1263 | [A] - CHRIS DICK ET AL, "Implementing a Real-Time Beamformer on an FPGA Platform Implementing a Real-Time Beamformer on an FPGA", XCELL JOURNAL, XX, XX, (20070601), pages 36 - 40, URL: http://www.xilinx.com/publications/xcellonline/xcell_60/xc_pdf/p36-40 _60-beam.pdf, (20090721), XP002538192 [A] 4,7 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2010091290 | - J.F.SYNNEVAG, "Adaptive Beamforming Applied to Medical Ultrasound Imaging", IEEE TRANS. ULTRASOUND, FERROELECTRICS, AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (200708), vol. 54, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1109/TUFFC.2007.431, XP011190325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TUFFC.2007.431 | - M.KARKOOTI, "FPGA Implementation of Matrix Inversion Using QRD-RLS Algorithm", ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTERS, (200510), doi:doi:10.1109/ACSSC.2005.1600043, pages 1625 - 1629, XP010900293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2005.1600043 |