|
11.04.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
04.04.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
30.11.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2016 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2015 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
16.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
04.05.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Abstract |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.02.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
07.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
07.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
01.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
26 |
|
06.04.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |