EP2556597 - A PRECODER STRUCTURE FOR MIMO PRECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/23] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMMARWALL, David Hällmarksvägen 59 18653 Vallentuna / SE | 02 /
JÖNGREN, George Karlsviksgatan 15 STOCKHOLM Se-112 41 / SE | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/23] |
Former [2013/07] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11715085.4 | 06.04.2011 | [2017/23] | WO2011SE50416 | Priority number, date | US20100321679P | 07.04.2010 Original published format: US 321679 P | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011126447 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556597 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2556597 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04, H04B7/06, H04L5/00, H04W72/04 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H04B7/0647 (EP,US);
H04B7/0456 (US);
H04B7/0478 (EP,US);
H04B7/0634 (EP,US);
H04B7/065 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04B7/0465 (EP,US);
H04B7/0469 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/07] | H04B7/04, H04B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | PRECODERSTRUKTUR FÜR MIMO-VORCODIERUNG | [2013/07] | English: | A PRECODER STRUCTURE FOR MIMO PRECODING | [2013/07] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DISPOSITIF DE CODAGE PRÉALABLE POUR CODAGE PRÉALABLE MIMO | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 03.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.10.2016 | 18.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17174250.5 / EP3300263 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2011 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 06.04.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 06.04.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HR | 07.06.2017 | |
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | HR | 07.06.2017 | |
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X] - Ericsson, ST-Ericsson, "R1-101742 Further Refinements of Feedback Framework", 3GPP Draft, (20100406), pages 1 - 8, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20110530), XP002639656 [X] 1-32 * page 1 - page 7 * | [A] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Possible Refinement on 8Tx Codebook Design", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-102104 TI 8TX MIMO, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20100406), vol. RAN WG1, no. Beijing, china; 20100412, XP050419422 [A] 4,7,11,14,17,21,24,28 * page 1 - page 6 * | by applicant | US20110321679 |