EP2557918 - METHODS FOR INCREASING EFFECTIVENESS OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS IN POLYMERIC FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Blvd. Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Kevin, O. 2255 Par Lane Willoughby Hills, OH 44094 / US | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11715108.4 | 25.03.2011 | WO2011US29925 | Priority number, date | US20100426914P | 23.12.2010 Original published format: US 426914 P | US20100323890P | 14.04.2010 Original published format: US 323890 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011129982 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2557918 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/10, A01N59/00, A01N59/16, A01N31/16, A01N33/12, A01N37/36, A61L15/46, A61L27/34, A61K9/70, B32B27/32, C09D131/04, C09D5/14, C08J9/04, A01N25/34 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A01N25/10 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B32B27/306 (EP,US);
B32B27/325 (EP,US);
B32B27/327 (EP,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
C09D5/1675 (EP,US);
C09D5/1693 (EP,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7145 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7242 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7248 (EP,US);
B32B2535/00 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3192 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N25/10, A01N31/16, A01N33/12, A01N37/36, A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A01N25/34, A01N31/16, A01N33/12, A01N37/36, A01N59/16 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/08] | A01N25/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER WIRKSAMKEIT VON ANTIMIKROBIELLEN STOFFEN BEI POLYMERFOLIEN | [2013/08] | English: | METHODS FOR INCREASING EFFECTIVENESS OF ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS IN POLYMERIC FILMS | [2013/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AUGMENTATION DE L'EFFICACITÉ D'AGENTS ANTIMICROBIENS DANS DES FILMS POLYMÈRES | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | EP13003432.5 / EP2649878 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4237114 (CARDARELLI NATHAN F) [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * column 3, lines 15-25 * * column 6, lines 45-64 *; | [Y]US5093164 (BAUER FRANK T [US], et al) [Y] 92-111 * column 4, lines 13-44; figure 4 *; | [XY]JPH04359028 (SHOWA DENKO KK, et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,12,13,16,20,22-25,28,30,33,34,37,40,41 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0019]; examples 1, 3, comparative 2 * [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91; | [XYI]WO9629361 (BIOSHIELD UK LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,12,16,20,43,45,55,56,62,63 * page 3, lines 1-7, 19-25 * * page 4, lines 25-26 * * page 5, lines 2-5 * [Y] 65-80,83-91 [I] 6,9,14,21,26,27,29,31,32,35,42,44,48-54,57,64; | [X]US5929133 (WATANABE TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,15,19,20,22,23,33,34,36,40,41,43,45,55,56,62,63 * claims 1, 6 *; | [Y]WO9954133 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [Y] 92-111 * page 16, lines 18-22 * * page 11, lines 14-27 * * page 13, lines 17-22 * * page 15, lines 8-12 *; | [Y]DE10101902 (MITSUBISHI POLYESTER FILM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * paragraph [0001] *; | [Y]WO03018312 (WIHURI OY [FI], et al) [Y] 92-111 * page 4, lines 21-28 *; | [X]US2005249791 (HOBBS TERRY R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,13,15,16,19,20,22,23,33,34,36,37,40,41,43,45,55,56,58,59,62,63 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 53] * * paragraphs [0124] - [0219] *; | [Y]WO2008128896 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al) [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * pages 1-2, paragraph Summary * * page 17, line 7 *; | [Y]WO2008139593 (TENSHI NO TSUBASA CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 65-80,83-111* abstract; paragraph [0051]; figure 2 *; | [XY] - M. B. FEDOROV ET AL, "Antimicrobial activity of core-sheath surgical sutures modified with poly-3-hydroxybutyrate", APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND MICROBIOLOGY, (20071101), vol. 43, no. 6, doi:10.1134/S0003683807060075, ISSN 0003-6838, pages 611 - 615, XP055020763 [X] 1,2,12,16-18,22,23,33,37-39,43-45,55,59-61 * MATERIALS AND METHODS; page 611 * * Suture structure; page 612 * [Y] 3-11,13-15,21,24-32,42,46-54,56-58,64-82,85-91 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S0003683807060075 | [XY] - STEFAN BRZEZINSKI ET AL, "Bacteriostatic textile-polymeric coat materials modified with nanoparticles", POLIMERY, (20070101), vol. 52, no. 5, pages 362 - 366, XP055020624 [X] 22,23,33-39 * abstract * * page 364, column 1, lines 3-8 * [Y] 1-11,21-32,42,46-61,64-82,85-91 | [Y] - E. L. ZAKHAROVA ET AL, "SEARCH FOR NEW THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCES USE OF ETHYLENE--VINYL ACETATE COPOLYMERS FOR CREATING LONG-ACTING THERAPEUTIC SYSTEMS WITH CONTROLLED RELEASE OF AGENTS (REVIEW)", PHARMACEUTICAL CHEMISTRY JOURNAL, (19931101), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 739 - 747, XP055020628 [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * "Kinetics of Drug Release..."; pages 741-742 * | [Y] - TALLURY ET AL, "Poly(ethylene-co-vinyl acetate) copolymer matrix for delivery of chlorhexidine and acyclovir drugs for use in the oral environment: Effect of drug combination, copolymer composition and coating on the drug release rate", DENTAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070222), vol. 23, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.DENTAL.2006.02.011, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 404 - 409, XP005924728 [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * page 408, paragraph 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dental.2006.02.011 | [XY] - V. RUGGERI ET AL, "Synthesis, characterization, andin vitro activity of antibiotic releasing polyurethanes to prevent bacterial resistance", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH PART A, (20070501), vol. 81A, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jbm.a.30984, ISSN 1549-3296, pages 287 - 298, XP055020631 [X] 22,23,33,37-39 * page 296, column 1, lines 32-38 * * MATERIALS AND METHODS; pages 288-290 * [Y] 1-18,21,24-32,34-36,42-61,64-82,85-91 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.a.30984 | [Y] - MAYUR UTTARWAR ET AL, "Fabrication of porous, drug-releasing, biodegradable, polymer scaffolds for sustained drug release", JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH PART B: APPLIED BIOMATERIALS, (20081001), vol. 87B, no. 1, doi:10.1002/jbm.b.31077, ISSN 1552-4973, pages 121 - 131, XP055020767 [Y] 1-18,21-39,42-61,64-82,85-91 * "Single-Layered Scaffolds"; pages 129-130 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbm.b.31077 | [XYI] - TALLURY ET AL, "Effects of solubilizing surfactants and loading of antiviral, antimicrobial, and antifungal drugs on their release rates from ethylene vinyl acetate copolymer", DENTAL MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070616), vol. 23, no. 8, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 977 - 982, XP022119236 [X] 1-4,12,16,19,20,22-25,33,37,40,41,43,45-47,55,59,62,63 * pages 979-981, paragraphs 3-4 * [Y] 65-80,83-91 [I] 6,9,14,21,26,27,29,31,32,35,42,44,48-54,57,64 | [X] - JUN LI ET AL, "In vitro drug release study of methacrylate polymer blend system: effect of polymer blend composition, drug loading and solubilizing surfactants on drug release", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE: MATERIALS IN MEDICINE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20091024), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 1573-4838, pages 583 - 588, XP019770750 [X] 1,2,12,16,19,20,22,23,33,37,40,41,43,45,62,63 * page 586; table 4 * | Examination | US5766699 | US5895694 | US6455161 | WO03055681 | EP1391294 | US2007237916 | US2007264453 | by applicant | US3985826 | US5708083 | US6812292 | EP1985585 | US2010272831 | US20110323890 |