EP2542238 - COMPOUNDS FOR IMMUNOPROTEASOME INHIBITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onyx Therapeutics, Inc. 249 E. Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHENK, Kevin D. 565 Arastradero Road 203 Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 02 /
PARLATI, Francesco 1035 York Street San Francisco California 94110 / US | 03 /
BENNETT, Mark K. 9 Fieldbrook Place Moraga California 94556 / US | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2014/02] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/02] | Coehn, Markus Fish & Richardson P.C. High Light Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11715320.5 | 01.03.2011 | [2015/33] | WO2011US26629 | Priority number, date | US20100309366P | 01.03.2010 Original published format: US 309366 P | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011109355 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542238 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2542238 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4045, A61K31/5375, C07D209/20, C07D295/104, A61P37/00, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, A61P31/00, A61P25/00, C07F5/04, C07K5/065 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61K31/4045 (KR);
C07K5/0827 (US);
A61K31/5375 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07D209/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D241/24 (EP,US);
C07D295/104 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR IMMUNPROTEASOMHEMMUNG | [2013/02] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR IMMUNOPROTEASOME INHIBITION | [2013/02] | French: | COMPOSÉS POUR INHIBITION DE L'IMMUNOPROTÉASOME | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2011 | AL | 12.08.2015 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | RS | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | IE | 01.03.2016 | LU | 01.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 01.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 01.03.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
IE | 01.03.2016 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
LU | 01.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006099261 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [X] 1,6-12 * the whole document * * Compound; page 8, line 18 *; | [YA]WO2006086600 (CEPHALON INC [US], et al) [Y] 14,24-32 * the whole document * * page 48, line 8 - line 22 * * page 52, line 7 - line 10 * [A] 16-18; | [XP]WO2010036357 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-3,5-9,11-13,24-32 * page 19 - page 20; compounds 16, 22 *; | [XP]WO2010145376 (UNIV BEIJING [CN], et al) [XP] 1,5-8,11-13,15,19,24-32 * the whole document * * compounds 5a-j, 6a-j * | [XAY] - ZHU Y ET AL, "Design, synthesis and biological evaluation of tripeptide boronic acid proteasome inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 17, no. 19, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.BMC.2009.08.023, ISSN 0968-0896, (20091001), pages 6851 - 6861, (20090820), XP026601532 [X] 1-3,5-8,11-13,15,19,24-32 * the whole document * * page 6854 - page 6855; examples 6a-m, 7a-m * [A] 9,10,17,18,21-23 [Y] 4,14,16,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmc.2009.08.023 | [X] - WATANABE T ET AL, "Synthesis of boronic acid derivatives of tyropeptin: Proteasome inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, vol. 19, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.BMCL.2009.02.117, ISSN 0960-894X, (20090415), pages 2343 - 2345, (20090304), XP026079469 [X] 1,8-13,24-32 * the whole document * * page 2344; examples 3a-c, 13a-c * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2009.02.117 | [X] - PIVAZYAN, A.D.; MATTESON, D.S.; FRABRY-ASZTALOS, L.; SINGH, R.P.; LIN, P-F.; BLAIR, W.; GUO, K.; ROBINSON, B.; PRUSOFF, W.H., "Inhibition of HIC-1 Protease by a Boron-Modified Polypeptide", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 60, pages 927 - 936, XP002638798 [X] 1,27,32 * the whole document * * page 928; figure 2; compounds 4a-e * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(00)00432-9 | [Y] - ZHU, Y.; ZHAO, X.; ZHU, G.; LI, Y.; MA, Y.; YUAN, Y.; YANG, J.; HU, Y.; AI, L.; GAO, Q., "Design, Synthesis, Biological Evaluation, and Structure - Activity Relationship (SAR) Discussion of Dipeptidyl Boronate Proteasome Inhibitors, Part I: Comprehensive Undertanding of the SAR of a-Amino Acid Boronates", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 52, pages 4192 - 4199, XP002638799 [Y] 4,16,20,24-32 * the whole document * * page 4195; table 1; compounds 22, 24, 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9005093 | [YA] - ZHU Y Q ET AL, "3D-QSAR studies of boron-containing dipeptides as proteasome inhibitors with CoMFA and CoMSIA methods", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 44, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.EJMECH.2008.07.019, ISSN 0223-5234, (20090401), pages 1486 - 1499, (20080724), XP026003082 [Y] 20,24-32 * the whole document * * Compounds MG273, MG285, MG286, MG292, MG300, MG307-309; MG312, MG315, MG318, MG322, MG324, MG387, MG306, MG317, MG328, MG346, MG353, MG329; page 1488 - page 1494 * [A] 21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejmech.2008.07.019 | by applicant | WO9810779 | US5340736 | - FOX, WHITESELL, Organic Chemistry, JONES AND BARTLETT PUBLISHERS, (1994), pages 177 - 178 | - "Peptides and Mimics, Design of Conformationally Constrained", HRUBY, BOTEJU, Molecular Biology and Biotechnology: A Comprehensive Desk Reference, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 658 - 664 | - CASCIO ET AL., EMBO J, (2001), vol. 20, pages 2357 - 2366 | - EGERER ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2006), vol. 54, pages 1501 - 8 | - MENG ET AL., PNAS, (1999), vol. 96, pages 10403 - 10408 | - MACARY ET AL., PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, pages 3982 - 3987 | - QURESHI, N. ET AL., J. IMMUN., (2003), vol. 171, pages 1515 - 1525 | - PAUGAM ET AL., TRENDS PARASITOL., (2003), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 55 - 59 | - GONZALES ET AL., ARCH. MED. RES., (1997), vol. 28, pages 139 - 140 | - SZALAY ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (2006), vol. 168, pages 1542 - 52 | - YU, LAI, J VIROL, (2005), vol. 79, pages 644 - 648 | - SIMSEK ET AL., J VIROL, (2005), vol. 79, pages 12914 - 12920 | - KHAN ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 167, pages 6859 - 6868 | - TAWA ET AL., JCI, (1997), vol. 100, pages 197 - 203 | - ACHARYYA ET AL., JCI, (2004), vol. 114, pages 370 - 378 | - LECKER ET AL., FASEB J, (2004), vol. 18, pages 39 - 51 | - PALOMBELLA ET AL., CELL, (1994), vol. 78, pages 773 - 785 | - TRAENCKNER ET AL., EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 5433 - 5441 | - CIECHANOVER, A., CELL, (1994), vol. 79, pages 13 - 21 | - KUMATORI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 7071 - 7075 | - GAN ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 5565 - 5572 | - MISHTO ET AL., NEUROBIOL AGING, (2006), vol. 27, pages 54 - 66 | - DIAZ-HERNANDEZ ET AL., J NEUROSCI, (2003), vol. 23, pages 11653 - 1161 | - GARRETT, 1. R. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2003), vol. 111, pages 1771 - 1782 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - J. MED. CHEM., (2008), vol. 51, page 1068 | - STEIN ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 35, pages 3899 - 3908 | US20070820490 | US20000569748 |