EP2558719 - WIND POWER PLANT WITH MODULAR TOWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 (Oval Office) 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states REpower Systems SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAMUELSEN, Olaf Kätnerweg 2 24852 Jerrisbek / DE | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11715497.1 | 14.04.2011 | [2016/30] | WO2011EP55969 | Priority number, date | DE20101015075 | 15.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010015075 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011141270 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2558719 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2558719 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/20, E04H12/28 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
E04H12/28 (EP,US);
F03D80/88 (EP,US);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (EP,US);
F05B2230/60 (EP,US);
F05B2240/40 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02E10/728 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | F03D11/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDENERGIEANLAGE MIT MODULAREM TURMSYSTEM UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN | [2013/08] | English: | WIND POWER PLANT WITH MODULAR TOWER SYSTEM | [2013/08] | French: | ÉOLIENNE COMPORTANT UN SYSTÈME DE TOUR MODULAIRE | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2011 | AL | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | HR | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | LV | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | MK | 27.07.2016 | MT | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | RS | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | SM | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | NO | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | AT | 14.04.2017 | IE | 14.04.2017 | LU | 14.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MK | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AL | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.07.2016 | |
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
MT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
AT | 14.04.2017 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 14.04.2017 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 14.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 27.07.2016 | |
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
SM | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LV | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
HR | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RS | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
NO | 27.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0036724 (DAN CONTROL ENGINEERING A S [DK], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 9 ** figures 1,2,3 *; | [Y]WO2004031578 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [Y] 15,16,18,19 * abstract * * page 8, line 11 - line 17 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE10305689 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-3 *; | [XYI]WO2008000565 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,12,17,20 * abstract * * page 2, line 11 - line 25 * * page 5, line 14 - line 20 * * page 5, line 26 - line 29 * * page 6, line 9 - line 36 * * page 9, line 13 - line 25 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 3 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 15,16,18,19 [I] 4,9,11,13,14; | [XI]US2009031668 (LLORENTE GONZALEZ JOSE IGNACIO [ES]) [X] 1-3,5,8,12,17,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] * * figures 1-8 * [I] 9-11,13,14; | [A]EP2093417 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 1-3 * |