EP2582522 - MOUNTING FOR THE MAIN CYLINDERS OF PRINTING PRESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITTENHÖFER, Thomas Steingarten 10 97519 Humprechtshausen / DE | 02 /
HAASLER, Markus Nossener Str. 33 01662 Meißen / DE | 03 /
FRÜHWALD, Andreas Beigasse 2 91460 Baudenbach / DE | [2013/17] | Application number, filing date | 11715498.9 | 15.04.2011 | [2016/32] | WO2011EP55982 | Priority number, date | DE20101024031 | 16.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010024031 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011157463 | Date: | 22.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582522 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2582522 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/28, B41F13/36 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
B41F13/28 (EP);
B41F13/36 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | B41F13/21, B41F13/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAGERUNG DER HAUPTZYLINDER VON DRUCKMASCHINEN | [2013/17] | English: | MOUNTING FOR THE MAIN CYLINDERS OF PRINTING PRESSES | [2013/17] | French: | PALIER POUR CYLINDRES PRINCIPAUX DE MACHINES À IMPRIMER | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2011 | AL | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | DK | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | ES | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | MT | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | TR | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | AT | 15.04.2017 | IE | 15.04.2017 | LU | 15.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 15.04.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MK | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 15.04.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.04.2011 | |
AL | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
AT | 15.04.2017 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
IE | 15.04.2017 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
LU | 15.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
DK | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
ES | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10021233 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER OHG [DE] SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1342570 (TOKYO KIKAI SEISAKUSHO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [AD] - FAG OEM und Handel AG, "Die Gestaltung von Wälzlagerungen; Publ.-Nr. WL 00 200/5 DA, Ziffer 114", (20090731), URL: http://www.schaeffler.com/remotemedien/media/_shared_media/library/downloads/wl_00200_5_t7-8_de_de.pdf, (20110511), XP002636565 [AD] 1-8 | by applicant | - Die Gestaltung von Wälzlagerungen |