EP2563876 - FLAMEPROOF AGENT STABILISER COMBINATION FOR THERMOPLASTIC AND DUROPLASTIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/38] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | ||
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BV) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖROLD, Sebastian Schmutterstrasse 8c 86420 Diedorf / DE | 02 /
BAUER, Harald Rauschgraben 36 50170 Kerpen / DE | 03 /
HILL, Michael Claudiusstieg 1b 22043 Hamburg / DE | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/10] | 01 /
HÖROLD, Sebastian Schmutterstrasse 8c 86420 Diedorf / DE | ||
02 /
BAUER, Harald Rauschgraben 36 50170 Kerpen / DE | |||
03 /
HILL, Michael Jüthornstrasse 33 22043 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | Mikulecky, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2013/10] | Jacobi, Carola, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11715669.5 | 20.04.2011 | [2016/23] | WO2011EP02017 | Priority number, date | DE20101018680 | 29.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010018680 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134623 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563876 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563876 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2563876 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/12, C08K5/5313 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/5313 (EP,US);
C08K13/02 (US);
C09K21/12 (EP,US);
C08K2201/014 (EP,US);
C08K3/016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2016/27] |
Former [2013/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMSCHUTZMITTEL-STABILISATOR-KOMBINATION FÜR THERMOPLASTISCHE UND DUROPLASTISCHE POLYMERE | [2013/10] | English: | FLAMEPROOF AGENT STABILISER COMBINATION FOR THERMOPLASTIC AND DUROPLASTIC POLYMERS | [2013/10] | French: | ASSOCIATION AGENT IGNIFUGE-STABILISATEUR POUR POLYMÈRES THERMOPLASTIQUES ET THERMODURCISSABLES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 03.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19734437 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19820398 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-16* example -; claim - *; | [AD]DE19933901 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10241126 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009109318 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2010076132 (LEVCHIK SERGEI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE2252258 | DE2447727 | EP0699708 | WO9616948 | DE19614424 | WO9739053 | WO9839306 | DE19734437 | DE19737727 | DE19920276 | DE19933901 | US2006045770 | US2008132619 | - Plastics Additives Handbook, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (2000), pages 80 - 84 | WO1997EP01664 |