|
26.06.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.05.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
211 |
|
12.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
195 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
18 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.07.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
17 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
17 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.06.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.03.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
31.01.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
17 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
141 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
151 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
238 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.07.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
213 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |