Designated contracting states | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | Lapse: 10.07.2013 | TR | | Examination procedure | 10.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | | 28.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 28.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | European patent granted | 10.07.2013 | Opposition procedure | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2014 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.12.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 05.12.2012 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Event date: | 05.12.2012 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120828 | | Event date: | 09.01.2013 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20121213 | | Event date: | 16.01.2013 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SPIROGEN SARL | | Event date: | 24.04.2013 | | Event description: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20130402 | | Event date: | 14.06.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1174543 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 10.07.2013 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Event date: | 10.07.2013 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 10.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 15.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 14.08.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 05.09.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602011002326 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20130905 | | Event date: | 14.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 29.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 14.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | Effective DATE: | 20131011 | | Event date: | 13.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 17.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20131008 | | Event date: | 21.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2430567 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20131121 | | Event date: | 15.07.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 620553 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20130715 | | Event date: | 02.12.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO T2 | Code Expl.: | +ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY [PUBL. OF TRANSLATION] | Effective DATE: | 20130710 | | Event date: | 02.12.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK T3 E 14991 SK | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAK | | Event date: | 17.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK GR 1174543 HK | Code Expl.: | +STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG | | Event date: | 31.12.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 17.02.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E008675 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20131126 | | Event date: | 18.06.2014 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20140411 | | Event date: | 24.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602011002326 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20140411 | | Event date: | 28.07.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E019736 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Event date: | 09.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 23.09.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150827 AND 20150902 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SPIROGEN SARL, CH | | Event date: | 16.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NO CHAD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER'S NAME OR ADDRESS (PAR. 44 PATENT LAW, PAR. PATENTFORSKRIFTEN) | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | | Event date: | 16.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE GB1A E008675 EE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE IN THE OWNERSHIP OR IN THE ADDRESS OF THE OWNER | | Event date: | 19.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602011002326 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE | | Event date: | 09.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT PC4A | Code Expl.: | TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | Effective DATE: | 20151026 | | Event date: | 23.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED | Effective DATE: | 20151217 | | Event date: | 31.12.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI SP73 | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF DATA ON OWNER | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED; GB | Effective DATE: | 20151111 | | Event date: | 19.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602011002326 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LTD., GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SPIROGEN SARL, ST-LEGIER-LA CHIESAZ, CH | | Event date: | 24.04.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 5 | | Event date: | 02.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK PC4A E 14991 SK | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT AND TRANSFER OF RIGHTS | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, CAMBRIDGE, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: SPIROGEN SARL, ST-LEGIER-LA CHIESAZ, CH | Effective DATE: | 20160112 | | Event date: | 19.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CA | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | Effective DATE: | 20160114 | | Event date: | 19.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | Effective DATE: | 20160114 | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU FH1C | Code Expl.: | APPOINTMENT OF REPRESENTATIVE | Free Format Text: | FORMER REPRESENTATIVE(S): FRANKNE DR. MACHYTKA DAISY, GOEDOELLE, KEKES, MESZAROS & SZABO SZABADALMI ES VEDJEGY IRODA, HU | REPRESENTATIVE: | GOEDOELLE, KEKES, MESZAROS & SZABO SZABADALMI , HU | | Event date: | 29.02.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU GB9C | Code Expl.: | SUCCESSION IN TITLE | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER(S): SPIROGEN SARL, CH | | Event date: | 14.01.2014 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20130402065 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20131118 | | Event date: | 15.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT PC 620553 AT T | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE OWNER | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LIMITED, GB | Effective DATE: | 20160303 | | Event date: | 29.04.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20130710 | | Event date: | 26.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 6 | | Event date: | 04.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | MEDIMMUNE LLIMITED; GB | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: SPIROGEN SARL | Effective DATE: | 20160108 | | Event date: | 29.11.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602011002326 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0047480000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K0047500000 | | Event date: | 25.04.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 7 | | Event date: | 25.04.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 8 | | Event date: | 09.10.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR TUEP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR EP VALIDATION RECEIVED | | Event date: | 22.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR T1PR P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN CROATIA | | Event date: | 03.11.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR PNAN P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF THE APPLICANT NAME, ADDRESS/RESIDENCE | OWNER: | SPIROGEN SàRL, CH | | Event date: | 17.05.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20190411 | Year of Fee Payment: | 9 | | Event date: | 15.05.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20200414 | Year of Fee Payment: | 10 | | Event date: | 30.04.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20210409 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 07.06.2013 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 27.05.2013 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 01.04.2013 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 02.11.2012 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 16.05.2014 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 16.05.2014 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 29.04.2022 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20220324 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 28.04.2023 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20230321 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 14.06.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230329 | | Event date: | 30.11.2023 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Payment DATE: | 20230411 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 29.02.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Payment DATE: | 20230323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 08.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 15.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 16.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20240319 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20240327 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.04.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 26.04.2024 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HR ODRP P20130953 HR | Code Expl.: | +RENEWAL FEE FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF A PATENT | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20240329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Payment DATE: | 20240321 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20240315 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.05.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 01.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Payment DATE: | 20240419 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 08.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240426 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 10.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240425 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 11.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20240403 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 18.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240501 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 22.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20240506 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 23.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20240328 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20240318 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Payment DATE: | 20240320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240425 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20240426 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20240404 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20240522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | |