EP2563811 - Immunoassay for Chromogranin A, antibodies and kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | IMMUNOASSAY FOR CHROMOGRANIN A, ANTIBODIES AND KIT | ||
[2016/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Euro-Diagnostica AB P.O. Box 50117 202 11 Malmö / SE | [2017/10] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Euro-diagnostica AB P.O. Box 50117 202 11 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRIDSBERG, Mats Grandungevagen 13 756 46 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
SOMMARIN, Yngve P.O. Box 50117 202 11 Malmö / SE | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Habets, Winand Life Science Patents PO Box 5096 6130 PB Sittard / NL | ||
Former [2013/10] | Habets, Winand Life Science Patents P.O. Box 5096 6130 PB Sittard / NL | Application number, filing date | 11716561.3 | 28.04.2011 | [2017/10] | WO2011EP56763 | Priority number, date | EP20100161375 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10161375 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135035 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563811 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563811 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, G01N33/68 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G01N33/577 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (US);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/26 (US);
C07K16/30 (US);
G01N33/53 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Immunoassay für Chromogranin A, sowie Antikörper und Kit | [2016/38] | English: | Immunoassay for Chromogranin A, antibodies and kit | [2016/38] | French: | Dosage immunologique de la Chromogranine A, anticorps et kit | [2016/38] |
Former [2013/10] | IMMUNASSAY FÜR CHROMOGRANIN A, ANTIKÖRPER UND KIT | ||
Former [2013/10] | IMMUNOASSAY FOR CHROMOGRANIN A, ANTIBODIES AND KIT | ||
Former [2013/10] | DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE DE LA CHROMOGRANINE A, ANTICORPS ET KIT | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 04.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 08.03.2017 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | IE | 28.04.2017 | LU | 28.04.2017 | MT | 28.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
MT | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
MT | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
MT | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
MT | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
MT | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 08.03.2017 | |
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1078266 (CIS BIO INT [FR]) [AD] 1-4 * examples 2, 3; claims 1-21; tables 2, 3 * * the whole document *; | [IA] - TARTAGLIA ANDREAS ET AL, "Chromogranin A in gastric neuroendocrine tumours: an immunohistochemical and biochemical study with region-specific antibodies.", VIRCHOWS ARCHIV : AN INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY APR 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16408221, (200604), vol. 448, no. 4, ISSN 0945-6317, pages 399 - 406, XP002585661 [I] 1-3 * tables 2, 3 * * the whole document * [A] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00428-005-0113-1 | [IA] - PORTELA-GOMES G M ET AL, "Chromogranin A in human neuroendocrine tumors: An immunohistochemical study with region-specific antibodies", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF SURGICAL PATHOLOGY, RAVEN PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010101), vol. 25, no. 10, ISSN 0147-5185, pages 1261 - 1267, XP009134371 [I] 1-3 * tables 2, 3 * * the whole document * [A] 4 | [A] - CORTI A ET AL, "Antigenic regions of human chromogranin A and their topographic relationships with structural/functional domains.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY / FEBS 15 JAN 1996 LNKD- PUBMED:8631342, (19960115), vol. 235, no. 1-2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 275 - 280, XP002585662 [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - GILL B M ET AL, "Chromogranin a epitopes: Clues from synthetic peptides and peptide mapping", NEUROPEPTIDES, CHURCHILL LIVINGSTONE, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0143-4179(92)90521-W, vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0143-4179, (19920201), pages 105 - 118, (19920201), XP026324392 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0143-4179(92)90521-W | [A] - STRIDSBERG M, "Measurements of chromogranins and chromogranin-related peptides by immunological methods.", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY 2000 LNKD- PUBMED:11192592, (2000), vol. 482, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 319 - 327, XP009134372 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | Examination | - PORTELA-GOMES GUIDA MARIA ET AL, "Selective processing of chromogranin A in the different islet cells in human pancreas", JOURNAL OF HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CYTOCHEMISTRY, (200104), vol. 49, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1177/002215540104900408, ISSN 0022-1554, pages 483 - 490, XP055140080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/002215540104900408 | by applicant | US4758522 | EP1078266 | - BAJETTA, E., FERRARI, L., MARTINETTI, A., CELIO, L., PROCOPIO, G., ARTALE, S., ZILEMBO, N., DI BARTOLOMEO, M., SEREGNI, E., BOMBAR, "Chromogranin A, neuron specific enolase, carcinoembryonic antigen, and hydroxyindole acetic acid evaluation in patient with neuroendocrine tumours", CANCER, (1999), vol. 86, pages 858 - 865 | - ERIKSSON, B., OBERG, K., STRIDSBERG, M., "Tumour markers in neuroendocrine tumours", DIGESTION, (2000), vol. 62, pages 33 - 38 | - K6HLER, MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - KONECKI ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 17026 - 17030 | - O'CONNOR, D.T., DEFTOS, L.J., "Secretion of chromogranin A by peptide-producing endocrine neoplasms", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1986), vol. 314, pages 1145 - 1151 | - STRIDSBERG, M., HELLMAN, U., WILANDER, E., LUNDQVIST, G., HELLSING, K., OBERG, K., "Fragments of chromogranin A are present in the urine of patients with carcinoid tumours: Development of a specific radioimmunoassay for chromogranin A and its fragments", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 139, pages 329 - 337 | - STRIDSBERG, M., OBERG, K., LI, Q., ENGSTR6M, U., LUNDQVIST, G., "Measurements of chromogranin A, chromogranin B (secretogranin I), chromogranin C (secretogranin II) and pancreastatin in plasma and urine from patients with carcinoid tumours and endocrine pancreatic tumours", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1995), vol. 144, pages 49 - 59, XP009130179 | - STRIDSBERG, M., "Measurements of chromogranins and chromogranin-related peptides by immunological methods", ADVANCED EXPERIMENTAL AND MEDICAL BIOLOGY, (2000), vol. 482, pages 319 - 327, XP009134372 | - WINKLER, H., FISCHER-COLBRIE, R., "The chromogranin A and B: The first 25 years and future perspectives", NEUROSCIENCE, (1992), vol. 49, doi:doi:10.1016/0306-4522(92)90222-N, pages 497 - 528, XP024385810 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0306-4522(92)90222-N |