Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9322828 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2016 | B2 | US2013084585 | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5883848B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2016 | B2 | JP2013525792 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102869681B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2015 | B | CN102869681 | 09.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011247621B | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | B2 | AU2011247621 | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563811 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2017 | B1 | EP2563811 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | EP11716561 | 28.04.2011 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2623102T | 10.07.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | WO2011EP56763 | 28.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011135035 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2383293 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10161375 | 28.04.2010 |