EP2572128 - PRESSURE RELIEF VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dresser, Inc. Millennium I, 11th Floor 15455 Dallas Parkway Addison, TX 75001 / US | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONROE, James Allen 230 Pisgah Cemetery Rd. Forest Hill Louisiana 71346 / US | 02 /
SPENCER, Mychal Phillip 920 Twin Bridges Rd. Apt. 52 Alexandria Louisiana 71303 / US | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Williams, Andrew Richard Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11716772.6 | 18.04.2011 | WO2011US32906 | Priority number, date | US20100784417 | 20.05.2010 Original published format: US 784417 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011146192 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2572128 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/04 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
F16K17/0433 (EP,US);
F16K17/0426 (EP,US);
F16K25/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0396 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7747 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7797 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7904 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | DRUCKENTLASTUNGSVENTIL | [2013/13] | English: | PRESSURE RELIEF VALVE | [2013/13] | French: | SOUPAPE DE RÉDUCTION DE PRESSION | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1852642 (GERHARD GOETZE KG [DE]) [X] 1-10,14-20,22-31 * abstract * [I] 11-13,21; | [I]KR100926402B (SHUTTLE VALVE CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-10,14-20,22-31 * figures 2-5 *; | [XI]EP1857745 (IRCA SPA [IT]) [X] 14-20,22-31 * abstract * [I] 1-10; | [XI]EP1849968 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 14-20,22-31 * abstract * [I] 1-10; | [XI]DE102007049611 (KOES GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 14-20,22-31 * abstract * [I] 1-10; | [XI]GB1179360 (ADAMS LTD L [GB]) [X] 14-20,22-31 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * [I] 1-10 | by applicant | US20100784417 |