EP2556152 - A THERMOSTABLE SUCROSE PHOSPHORYLASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CERDOBBEL, An Poelstraat 64 B-Merelbeke 9820 / BE | 02 /
DESMET, Tom Vierboomstraat 19 B-Nevele 9850 / BE | 03 /
SOETAERT, Wim Tempeliersdreef 8 B-Lovendegem 9920 / BE | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Vanhalst, Koen, et al De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2013/07] | Application number, filing date | 11716852.6 | 01.04.2011 | WO2011EP55139 | Priority number, date | EP20110154339 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: EP 11154339 | EP20100194409 | 09.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10194409 | EP20100167989 | 30.06.2010 Original published format: EP 10167989 | GB20100005754 | 06.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201005754 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011124538 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556152 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/10, C12N11/14, C12N9/96 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
C12N9/1051 (EP,US);
C12N11/00 (EP,US);
C12N11/087 (EP,US);
C12N11/089 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | WÄRMEBESTÄNDE SACCHAROSE-PHOSPHORYLASE | [2013/07] | English: | A THERMOSTABLE SUCROSE PHOSPHORYLASE | [2013/07] | French: | SUCROSE PHOSPHORYLASE THERMOSTABLE | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 08.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2013 | Observations by third parties | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1661985 (EZAKI GLICO CO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A] - "SubName: Full=Sucrose phosphorylase; EC=2.4.1.7;", UniProt, (20030601), Database accession no. Q84HQ2, URL: EBI, XP002638620 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - VAN DEN BROEK L A M ET AL, "Physico-chemical and transglucosylation properties of recombinant sucrose phosphorylase from Bifidobacterium adolescentis DSM20083", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (20040801), vol. 65, no. 2, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 219 - 227, XP002464715 [ ] * page 219 - page 227 * | [XP] - AN CERDOBBEL ET AL, "Sucrose phosphorylase as cross-linked enzyme aggregate: Improved thermal stability for industrial applications", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20101101), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:10.1002/biot.201000202, ISSN 1860-6768, pages 1192 - 1197, XP055000105 [XP] 1-15 * page 1192 - page 1197 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201000202 | [XP] - AN CERDOBBEL ET AL, "Increasing the thermostability of sucrose phosphorylase by multipoint covalent immobilization", JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20101001), vol. 150, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jbiotec.2010.07.029, ISSN 0168-1656, pages 125 - 130, XP055000112 [XP] 1-15 * page 125 - page 130 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiotec.2010.07.029 | Examination | US2004115778 | - MATEO C ET AL, "Epoxy-amino groups: A new tool for improved immobilization of proteins by the epoxy method", BIOMACROMOLECULES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20030101), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1021/BM0257661, ISSN 1525-7797, pages 772 - 777, XP002347990 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm0257661 | - ROGER A. SHELDON, "Enzyme Immobilization: The Quest for Optimum Performance", doi:10.1002/adsc.200700082, (20070604), pages 1289 - 1307, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/store/10.1002/adsc.200700082/asset/1289_ftp.pdf?v=1&t=gpf4n19c&s=a120463782c4540b81922a25a06280f38afad6e7, (20110627), XP055001404 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adsc.200700082 | by applicant | US2008206822 | WO2008034158 | - J. BIOTECH, (2004), page 219 | - ZHAO ET AL., J. MOL. CATALYSIS, (2008), page 7 | - APPL. BIOCHEM. BIOTECHNOL., (1991), page 37 | - GOEDL ET AL., BIOCAT BIOTRANS, (2010), page 10 | - GOEDL ET AL., ANGEW CHEM INT ED ENGL, (2008), page 10086 | - DE MEY ET AL., BCM BIOTECHNOL., (2007), page 34 | - WEMER ET AL., Z. ANAL. CHEM, (1970), page 224 | - CLARK, D.S., TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1994), page 439 | - CAO ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2000), page 1361 | - WILSON ET AL., PROCESS BIOCHEM, (2009), page 322 | - CAO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (2003), page 387 | - NIDETZKY ET AL., BIOCHEL J., (2000), page 649 | - AERTS, D., VERHAEGHE, T., DE MEY, M., DESMET, T., SOETAERT, W., A CONSTITUTIVE EXPRESSION SYSTEM FOR HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREENING ENG. LIFE SCI., (2010), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 10 - 19 | - ALONSO-MORALES, N., LOPEZ-GALLEGO, F., BETANCOR, L., HIDALGO, A., MATEO, C., FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., "Reversible immobilization of glutaryl acylase on sepabeads coated with polyethyleneimine", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2004), vol. 20, pages 533 - 536 | - ALONSO, N., LOPEZ-GALLEGO, F., BETANCOR, L., HIDALGO, A., MATEO, C., GUISAN, J. M., FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., "Immobilization and stabilization of glutaryl acylase on aminated sepabeads supports by the glutaraldehyde crosslinking method", J. MOL. CATAL. B: ENZYM, (2005), vol. 35, doi:doi:10.1016/j.molcatb.2005.05.007, pages 57 - 61, XP004967955 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcatb.2005.05.007 | - BIMBERG, P. R., BRENNER, M. L., "A one-step enzymatic assay for sucrose with sucrose phosphorylase", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 142, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(84)90505-0, pages 556 - 561, XP024830319 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(84)90505-0 | - BOLIVAR, J. M., WILSON, L., FERRAROTTI, S. A., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., MATEO, C., "Stabilization of a formate dehydrogenase by covalent immobilization on highly activated glyoxyl-agarose supports", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2006), pages 669 - 673 | - CLARK, D. S., "Can immobilization be exploited to modify enzyme-activity", TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1994), vol. 12, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-7799(94)90018-3, pages 439 - 443, XP023594600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-7799(94)90018-3 | - FUJII, K., LIBOSHI, M., YANASE, M., TAKAHA, T., KURIKI, T., "Enhancing the thermal stability of sucrose phosphorylase from Streptococcus mutans by random mutagenesis", J. APPL. GLYCOSCI, (2006), vol. 53, pages 91 - 97 | - GOEDL, C., NIDETZKY, B., "Sucrose phosphorylase harbouring a redesigned, glycosyltransferase-like active site exhibits retaining glucosyl transfer in the absence of a covalent intermediate", CHEMBIOCHEM, (2009), vol. 10, pages 2333 - 2337 | - GOEDL, C., SCHWARZ, A., MINANI, A., NIDETZKY, B, "Recombinant sucrose phosphorylase from Leuconostoc mesenteroides: Characterization, kinetic studies of transglucosylation, and application of immobilised enzyme for production of alpha-D-glucose I-phosphate", J. BIOTECHNOL., (2007), vol. 129, pages 77 - 86 | - HENRISSAT, B., "A classification of glycosyl hydrolases based on amino-acid-sequence similarities", BIOCHEM. J., (1991), vol. 280, pages 309 - 316 | - HILTERHAUS, L., MINOW, B., MULLER, J., BERHEIDE, M., QUITMANN, H., KATZER, M., THUM, O., ANTRANIKIAN, G., ZENG, A. P., LIESE, A., "Practical application of different enzymes immobilized on sepabeads", BIOPROCESS BIOSYST. ENG., (2008), vol. 31, pages 163 - 171, XP019590885 | - KATCHALSKI-KATZIR, E., KRAEMER, D. M., "Eupergit (R) C, a carrier for immobilization of enzymes of industrial potential", J. MOL. CATAL. B: ENZYM, (2000), vol. 10, pages 157 - 176 | - KITAO, S., MATSUDO, T., SAITOH, M., HORIUCHI, T., SEKINE, H., "Enzymatic synthesis of 2 stable (-)-epigallocatechin gallate-glucosides by sucrose phosphorylase", BIOSCI., BIOTECHNOL., BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1271/bbb.59.2167, pages 2167 - 2169, XP055145380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb.59.2167 | - KOGA, T., NAKAMURA, K., SHIROKANE, Y., MIZUSAWA, K., KITAO, S., KIKUCHI, M., "Purification and some properties of sucrose phosphorylase from Leuconostoc mesenteroides", AGR. BIOL. CHEM, (1991), vol. 55, pages 1805 - 1810 | - LEE, J. H., YOON, S. H., NAM, S. H., MOON, Y. H., MOON, Y. Y., KIM, D., "Molecular cloning of a gene encoding the sucrose phosphorylase from Leuconostoc mesenteroides B-1149 and the expression in Escherichia coli.", ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.11.008, pages 612 - 620, XP025095020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.11.008 | - LOPEZ-GALLEGO, F., BETANCOR, L., HIDALGO, A., ALONSO, N., FEMANDEZ-LORENTE, G., GUISAN, J. M., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., "Preparation of a robust biocatalyst of D-amino acid oxidase on sepabeads supports using the glutaraldehyde crosslinking method", ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (2005), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.04.016, pages 750 - 756, XP025278485 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2005.04.016 | - LOPEZ-GALLEGO, F., BETANCOR, L., HIDALGO, A., DELLAMORA-ORTIZ, G., MATEO, C., FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., "Stabilization of different alcohol oxidases via immobilization and post immobilization techniques", ENZYME MICROB. TECHNOL., (2007), vol. 40, doi:doi:10.1016/j.enzmictec.2006.04.021, pages 278 - 284, XP005777353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enzmictec.2006.04.021 | - MATEO, C., ABIAN, O., FEMANDEZ-LORENTE, G., PEDROCHE, J., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., "Epoxy sepabeads: A novel epoxy support for stabilization of industrial enzymes via very intense multipoint covalent attachment", BIOTECHNOL. PROG, (2002), vol. 18, doi:doi:10.1021/bp010171n, pages 629 - 634, XP002347991 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp010171n | - MATEO, C., ARCHELAS, A., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., FURSTOSS, R., "Enzymatic transformations. Immobilized A-niger epoxide hydrolase as a novel biocatalytic tool for repeated- batch hydrolytic kinetic resolution of epoxides", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 1, pages 2739 - 2743, XP002388334 | - MATEO, C., GRAZU, V., PESSELA, B. C. C., MONTES, T., PALOMO, J. M., TORRES, R., LOPEZ-GALLEGO, F., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN,, "Advances in the design of new epoxy supports for enzyme immobilization-stabilization", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS, (2007), vol. 35, pages 1593 - 1601 | - "Sheldon RA, Schoevaart R, van Langen IM (2005) Crosslinked enzyme aggregates (CLEAs): a novel and versatile method for enzyme immobilization (a review)", BIOCATAL BIOTRANSFORMATION, vol. 23, pages 141 - 147 | - SEGURA, R. L., PALOMO, J. M., MATEO, C., CORTES, A., TERRENI, M., FEMANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., GUISAN, J. M., "Different properties of the lipases contained in porcine pancreatic lipase extracts as enantioselective biocatalysts", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2004), vol. 20, pages 825 - 829 | - SILVERSTEIN, R, VOET, J., REED, D., ABELES, R. H., "Purification and mechanism of action of sucrose phosphorylase", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1967), vol. 242, pages 1338 - 1346 | - SPROGOE, D., VAN DEN BROEK, L. A. M., MIRZA, O., KASTRUP, J. S., VORAGEN, A. G. J., GAJHEDE, M., SKOV, L. K., "Crystal structure of sucrose phosphorylase from Bifidobacterium adolescentis", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 43, pages 1156 - 1162 | - TEDOKON, M., SUZUKI, K., KAYAMORI, Y., FUJITA, S., KATAYAMA, Y., "Enzymatic assay of inorganic phosphate with use of sucrose phosphorylase and phosphoglucomutase", CLIN. CHEM., (1992), vol. 38, pages 512 - 515 | - TORRES, R., MATEO, C., FERNANDEZ-LORENTE, G., ORTIZ, C., FUENTES, M., PALOMO, J. M., GUISAN, J. M., FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., "A novel heterofunctional epoxy-amino sepabeads for a new enzyme immobilization protocol: Immobilization-stabilization of beta-galactosidase from Aspergillus oryzae", BIOTECHNOL. PROG, (2003), vol. 19, doi:doi:10.1021/bp025771g, pages 1056 - 1060, XP002652737 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bp025771g | - TORRES, R, PESSELA, B. C. C., MATEO, C., ORTIZ, C., FUENTES, M., GUISAN, J. M., FERNANDEZ-LAFUENTE, R., "Reversible immobilization of glucoamylase by ionic adsorption on sepabeads coated with polyethyleneimine", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2004), vol. 20, pages 1297 - 1300 | - UNSWORTH, L. D., VAN DER OOST, J., KOUTSOPOULOS, S., "Hyperthermophilic enzymes - stability, activity and implementation strategies for high temperature applications", FEBS J., (2007), vol. 274, doi:doi:10.1111/J.1742-4658.2007.05954.X, pages 4044 - 4056, XP003031356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1742-4658.2007.05954.X | - VAN DEN BROEK, L. A. M., VAN BOXTEL, E. L., KIEVIT, R. P., VERHOEF, R., BELDMAN, G., VORAGEN, A. G. J., "Physico-chemical and transglucosylation properties of recombinant sucrose phosphorylase from Bifidobacterium adolescentis DSM20083", APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL, (2004), vol. 65, pages 219 - 227, XP002464715 | - WAFFENSCHMIDT, S., JAENICKE, L., "Assay of reducing sugars in the nanomole range with 2,2'- bicinchoninate", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 165, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(87)90278-8, pages 337 - 340, XP024830121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(87)90278-8 | - WEINHAUSEL, A., GRIESSLER, R., KREBS, A., ZIPPER, P., HALTRICH, D., KULBE, K. D., NIDETZKY, B., "alpha-1,4-D-glucan phosphorylase of gram-positive Corynebacterium callunae: isolation, biochemical properties and molecular shape of the enzyme from solution X-ray scattering", BIOCHEM. J., (1997), vol. 326, pages 773 - 783, XP002198495 | other | - DE CORDT S. ET AL, "THERMOSTABILITY OF SOLUBLE AND IMMOBILIZED ALPHA AMYLASE FROM BACILLUS-LICHENIFORMIS", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19920101), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 396 - 402, XP002327765 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.260400309 | - MIRZA O. ET AL, "Structural rearrangements of sucrose phosphorylase from bifidobacterium adolescents during sucrose conversion", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL, (20061117), vol. 281, no. 46, pages 35576 - 35584, XP003031354 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M605611200 | - VIELLE C. ET AL, "Hyperthermophilic enzymes: sources, uses and molecular mechnisms for thermostability", MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (200103), vol. 65, no. 1, pages 1 - 43, XP003031355 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/mmbr.65.1.1-43.2001 | - UNSWORTH L.D. ET AL, "Hyperthermophilic enzymes - Stability, activity and implementation strategies for high temperature applications", FEBS JOURNAL, (2007), pages 4044 - 4056, XP003031356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1742-4658.2007.05954.X | - COLACINO F. ET AL, "Enzyme thermostabilization: the state of the art", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND GINETIC ENGINEERING REVIEWS, (199704), vol. 14, pages 211 - 277, XP003031357 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02648725.1997.10647944 | - BRENA B.M. ET AL, "Immobilization of enzymes and cells", BRENA B.M. ET AL, GUISAN J.M., methods in biotechnology, HUMANA PRESS, (2006), pages 15 - 30, ISBN 9781588292902, XP003031358 | - CAO L. ET AL, "Immobilised enzymes: carrier-bound or carrier-free?", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2003), vol. 14, pages 387 - 394, XP003031359 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(03)00096-X | - HSIEH H-J. ET AL, "Immobilization of invertase via carbohydrate moiety on chitosan to enhance its thermal stability", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (2000), vol. 22, pages 1459 - 1464, XP003031360 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005602812037 | - MATSUMOTO M. ET AL, "Effect of immobilization on thermostability of lipase from candida rugosa", BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 75 - 77, XP003031361 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1369-703X(02)00138-9 | - ETTALIBI M. ET AL, "Sucrose hydrolysis by thermostable immobilized inulinases from aspergillus ficuum", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 28, pages 596 - 601, XP003031362 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(00)00342-2 |