EP2563197 - KIT COMPRISING A LIQUID CONTAINER AND A REFILL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt & Colman (Overseas) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIEPEN, Jacobus Simon Petrus Reckitt Benckiser Room C, 11/F, Tower C Peace Square Shenghe Road Nancheng Dongguan City Guangdong, 523009 / CN | 02 /
PADAIN, Christopher Leonard 16 Park Place Cottages Remenham Hill Remenham Henley on Thames RG9 3HW / GB | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11717000.1 | 20.04.2011 | WO2011GB50782 | Priority number, date | GB20100007226 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007226 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135337 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563197 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12, B67D7/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A47K5/1217 (EP,US);
B67D3/00 (KR);
B67D7/0294 (US);
A47K5/12 (KR);
B05B12/122 (EP,US);
B05B9/0426 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | KIT MIT EINEM FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER UND EINER NACHFÜLLVORRICHTUNG | [2013/10] | English: | KIT COMPRISING A LIQUID CONTAINER AND A REFILL DEVICE | [2013/10] | French: | KIT COMPRENANT UN CONTENEUR DE LIQUIDE ET UN DISPOSITIF DE REMPLISSAGE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/14] | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE9312110U (REIDEL HERMANN [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5,8 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 5 - page 9; figure - *; | [A]GB2279069 (MCIVER ARCHIBALD GERARD [GB]) [A] 1,3-7,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9621387 (SPRINTVEST CORP NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,3-5,8 * page 4 - page 8; figure - *; | [XY]DE20304356U (ERNST WAGNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 9 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3-5; | [YA]US2005155988 (MEEHAN STEVEN K [US], et al) [Y] 8 * page 3, paragraph 48 * * page 4, paragraph 54; figures 1-3 *[A] 1,2,4 | by applicant | GB20080020981 |