EP2563198 - A LIQUID DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reckitt & Colman (Overseas) Limited 103-105 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 3UH / GB | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DIEPEN, Jacobus Simon Petrus Reckitt Benckiser Room C, 11/F, Tower C Peace Square Shenghe Road Nancheng Dongguan City Guangdong, 523009 / CN | 02 /
PADAIN, Christopen Leonard 16 Park Place Cottages Remenham Hill Remenham Henley on Thames RG9 3HW / GB | 03 /
ZHOU, Xianzhi Reckitt Benckiser Room C, 11/F, Tower C Peace Square Shenghe Road Nancheng Dongguan City Guangdong, 523009 / CN | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull HU8 7DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Bowers, Craig Malcolm, et al Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11717001.9 | 20.04.2011 | WO2011GB50784 | Priority number, date | GB20100007232 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007232 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135338 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563198 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47K5/12 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A47K5/12 (KR);
A47K5/1202 (EP,US);
A47K5/1217 (EP,US);
B67D3/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABESYSTEM | [2013/10] | English: | A LIQUID DELIVERY SYSTEM | [2013/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE LIQUIDE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 25.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2008185396 (YANG FRANK [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8 * page 3, paragraph 33 - paragraph 43 * * page 4, paragraphs 48,56 * * page 5, paragraphs 62, 64, 65, 66; figures 1-3 * [I] 7; | [IY]WO2006134314 (MINDSINSYNC LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-6,8 * page 5, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1; figures 1-3,5 * [Y] 7; | [IY]US2004226962 (MAZURSKY RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 1-6,8 * page 1, paragraph 22 - paragraph 29 * * page 3, paragraph 35; figures 1-5, 8, 9 * [Y] 7; | [YA]US4018363 (CASSIA ANTONIO MACCHI) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,5 * [A] 1-3; | [A]US6814261 (GEBRAYEL NEHME [US]) [A] 1-3,5,8 * abstract * | by applicant | GB20080020981 |