EP2419353 - CONVEYOR ROLL WITH CENTRIFUGAL FORCE-OPERATED MAGNETIC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Via Gorelle 3 6592 Sant' Antonino / CH | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Interroll Holding AG Via Gorelle 3 6592 San' Antonio / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SÉJOURNÉ, Jérôme Lieu-dit Cotteuges FR-63320 Saint-Diery / FR | [2013/06] |
Former [2012/08] | 01 /
SÉJOURNÉ, Jérôme Le Plessis FR-85530 La Bruffiere / FR | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11717485.4 | 14.04.2011 | WO2011EP01904 | Priority number, date | EP20100290202 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10290202 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011128102 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2419353 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2419353 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2419353 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/075 | [2012/08] | CPC: |
B65G13/075 (EP,KR,US);
B65G1/08 (KR);
B65G17/24 (KR);
B65G23/08 (KR);
B65G47/261 (KR);
B65G47/266 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | FÖRDERROLLE MIT ZENTRIFUGALKRAFTBETRIEBENER MAGNETISCHER BREMSE | [2012/08] | English: | CONVEYOR ROLL WITH CENTRIFUGAL FORCE-OPERATED MAGNETIC BRAKE | [2012/08] | French: | ROULEAU DE TRANSPORTEUR AYANT UN FREIN MAGNÉTIQUE ACTIONNÉ PAR FORCE CENTRIFUGE | [2012/08] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/08] | 24.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2011 | AL | 10.10.2012 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | HR | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | MC | 10.10.2012 | MK | 10.10.2012 | MT | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | RS | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | SM | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | NO | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | IE | 14.04.2013 | LU | 14.04.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
BE | 10.10.2012 | ||
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 14.04.2013 | ||
LU | 14.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MK | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 14.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
SM | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 14.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
MT | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 14.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
IE | 14.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
MC | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/32] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
RS | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
HR | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
NO | 10.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08208011 (HAKKO ELECTRIC) [A] 1,2,6,7,9 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1243528 (SCHMALE ERHARD [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * | by applicant | DE7300091U | EP1243528 | DE20212979U | EP1847485 |