EP2563681 - WAFER POCKET WITH TEAR-OPEN WAFER ACCOMMODATING COMPARTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHARDT, Kathrin Speyerer Str. 4 10779 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FILLER, Sven Freiburger Str. 30 16515 Oranienburg / DE | 03 /
GOLLIN, Kirsten Ketziner Str. 10 14476 Potsdam / DE | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11717599.2 | 28.04.2011 | WO2011EP56788 | Priority number, date | DE20101028361 | 29.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010028361 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135050 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563681 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/30, B65D75/58, B65D83/04 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B65D75/30 (EP,US);
B65D73/00 (US);
B65D75/5805 (EP,US);
B65D83/0445 (EP,US);
A61J3/078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | WAFERTASCHE MIT AUFREIßBAREM WAFERAUFNAHMEFACH | [2013/10] | English: | WAFER POCKET WITH TEAR-OPEN WAFER ACCOMMODATING COMPARTMENT | [2013/10] | French: | POCHETTE POUR PLAQUETTE DE COMPRIMÉ COMPRENANT UN RÉCEPTACLE DÉCHIRABLE POUR PLAQUETTE DE COMPRIMÉ | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 22.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/50] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6708826 (GINSBERG STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 14,15* the whole document *; | [A]US2005084636 (PAPENFUSS DANIEL S [US], et al) [A] 3-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] *; | [A]US2006023976 (ALVATER PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0079]; figure 15 *; | [XI]WO2008108969 (MONOSOL RX LLC, et al) [X] 1,2,17 * page 5, line 1 - page 10, line 16; figures 1-2 * [I] 3-7,16; | [A]WO2009103771 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2010026142 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,17 * page 11, line 9 - page 14, line 19; figures 1-4 * [I] 16 | by applicant | WO03103950 | US6719678 | DE102004047447 |