EP2595758 - STATIC SPRAY MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/22] | STATIC SPRAY MIXER | ||
[2014/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Mixpac AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag / CH | [2015/12] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Sulzer Mixpac AG Rütistrasse 7 9469 Haag / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIEMER, Andreas Bügelhof 34 CH-8862 Schübelbach / CH | 02 /
STEMICH, Carsten, Dr Dorfstrasse 38 D-23847 Düchelsdorf / DE | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 11717673.5 | 09.05.2011 | WO2011EP57379 | Priority number, date | EP20100170141 | 20.07.2010 Original published format: EP 10170141 | [2013/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012010338 | Date: | 26.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2595758 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2595758 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/08, B01F5/06, B05B7/04, B05B7/10, B05C17/005 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B05B7/0861 (EP,US);
B05B7/08 (KR);
B05B7/04 (KR,US);
B01F25/40 (KR);
B01F25/4321 (EP,US);
B05C17/005 (KR);
B05B7/0408 (EP,US);
B05B7/10 (EP,US);
B05C17/00509 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATISCHER SPRÜHMISCHER | [2013/22] | English: | STATIC SPRAY MIXER | [2014/49] | French: | MÉLANGEUR DE PULVÉRISATION STATIQUE | [2014/49] |
Former [2013/22] | STATIC SPRAY MIXER | ||
Former [2013/22] | MÉLANGEUR À PULVÉRISATION STATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 21.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Request for further processing for: | 10.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 10.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.05.2011 | AL | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | IE | 09.05.2015 | LU | 09.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.05.2011 | |
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 09.05.2011 | |
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
IE | 09.05.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 09.05.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2356229 (TAMAI SHIGETAKE) [A] 9-12 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0663241 (RITZAU PARI WERK GMBH PAUL [DE]) [A] 9,14* column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 6; figures 1-4 *; | [XAI]EP0904844 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1,4-6,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0041]; figures 1-3,5,6 * [A] 2,3 [I] 7-10,12,13; | [A]US6601782 (SANDHOLM ALBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-4,8,9 *; | [AD]US6951310 (ANDERSON STEVEN R [US]) [AD] 1-15 * column 3, line 60 - column 7, line 16; figures 1-12 * | by applicant | EP0749776 | EP0815929 | US6951310 | EP20090168285 |