EP2638535 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND PLAYING BACK READ STORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Artenaproductions S.A. Techno-Pôle 3 3960 Sierre / CH | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVIOZ, Dominique Chemin de Clavoz 10 CH-1950 Sion / CH | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Avenue J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | P&TS SA (AG, Ltd.) Av. J.-J. Rousseau 4 P.O. Box 2848 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11717680.0 | 09.05.2011 | WO2011EP57447 | Priority number, date | CH20100001874 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: CH 18742010 | [2013/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062485 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638535 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/06 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
G09B5/06 (EP,CH)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG UND WIEDERGABE VON LESEGESCHICHTEN | [2013/38] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR RECORDING AND PLAYING BACK READ STORIES | [2013/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'ENREGISTREMENT ET LA RESTITUTION D'HISTOIRES LUES | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.03.2018 | 20.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/34] | 13.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]US6985693 (KIRWAN DEBRA GIAMPAPA [US]) [ID] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [I]GB2444748 (FLETCHER GEORGINA [GB]) [I] 3 * abstract *; | [AD]US6421524 (PADGETT RUSSELL S [US]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2008254427 (NEVIASER LYNN [US]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5577918 (CROWELL CHRISTOPHER S [US]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6167233 (GRESSER JR WILLIAM [US], et al) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * | Examination | US6408301 | by applicant | US6985693 | US6421524 | US2008254427 | US5577918 | US6167233 |