EP2542877 - SYSTEM FOR SURVEILLANCE OF AN AREA WITHIN WHICH PEOPLE MOVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finmeccanica - Società per azioni Piazza Monte Grappa 4 00195 Roma / IT | [2013/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIOLA, Roberto Via Montasio 31 I-00141 Roma / IT | 02 /
MENGALI, Sandro Via San Benedetto 6 I-06059 Todi / IT | 03 /
LIBERATORE, Nicola Via S. Sisto, 73/E I-67100 L'Aquila / IT | 04 /
PIERNO, Luigi Via Pier Vettori 19 I-00151 Roma / IT | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/02] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11717728.7 | 04.03.2011 | WO2011IB00460 | Priority number, date | IT2010TO00170 | 05.03.2010 Original published format: IT TO20100170 | [2013/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011107868 | Date: | 09.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2542877 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2542877 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/05, G01N21/35, G08B21/14 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
G01N21/0303 (EP,US);
G01J3/28 (US);
G01N21/05 (EP,US);
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G08B21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES BEREICHS, IN DEM SICH PERSONEN BEWEGEN | [2013/02] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SURVEILLANCE OF AN AREA WITHIN WHICH PEOPLE MOVE | [2013/02] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LA SURVEILLANCE D'UNE ZONE DANS LAQUELLE SE DÉPLACENT DES PERSONNES | [2013/02] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 04.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2011 | AL | 08.07.2015 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | RS | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | IE | 04.03.2016 | LU | 04.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO0194915 (ARETE ASSOCIATES [US], et al) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]WO2006013573 (MENDY ERAD LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102006055157 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claim 8 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO2009157977 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * | by applicant | WO0194915 | WO2008061949 |