|
30.04.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
52 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.12.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
05.08.2013 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2013 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
13 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.05.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.04.2012 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.02.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
53 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.06.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
35 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
12 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
43 |