Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5781599B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | B2 | JP2013526916 | 27.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102883657B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B | CN102883657 | 16.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2796983 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2018 | C | CA2796983 | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563223 | Global Dossier | 25.06.2014 | B1 | EP2563223 | 06.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | EP11717947 | 26.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2490290T | 03.09.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2563223T | 28.11.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP02083 | 26.04.2011 | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | EP11717947 | 26.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011134639 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10779759 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2020 | B2 | US2013085517 | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2382921 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10004578 | 30.04.2010 |