EP2563248 - PEDICLE SCREW AND DEVICE FOR STABILIZING THE SPINAL COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kraus, Kilian Ahornstrasse 67 97440 Werneck / DE | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/42] |
Former [2013/15] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Äußere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Mörtel & Höfner Äußere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11718004.2 | 28.04.2011 | [2016/42] | WO2011EP56696 | Priority number, date | DE20101028423 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010028423 | [2013/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135013 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563248 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563248 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/86 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/8605 (US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7038 (EP,US);
A61B17/704 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | A61B17/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PEDIKELSCHRAUBE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STABILISIERUNG DER WIRBELSÄULE | [2013/10] | English: | PEDICLE SCREW AND DEVICE FOR STABILIZING THE SPINAL COLUMN | [2013/10] | French: | VIS PÉDICULAIRE ET DISPOSITIF POUR STABILISER LA COLONNE VERTÉBRALE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 29.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | HR | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | LV | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | MK | 19.10.2016 | MT | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | RS | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | SM | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | NO | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | AT | 28.04.2017 | IE | 28.04.2017 | LU | 28.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
TR | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MK | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
MT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
AT | 28.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
IE | 28.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
LU | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
SM | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 19.10.2016 | |
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | DK | 19.10.2016 | |
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 19.10.2016 | |
HR | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LV | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RS | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
NO | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 19.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2006200131 (CHAO NAM T [US], et al) [Y] 4 * page 5, paragraphs 51-54 * * figure 5 * [A] 1-3; | [Y]WO2008089096 (LANX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-13,17,18 * page 20, paragraph 77 - page 21, paragraph 78 * * figures 5, 6, 13-16 *; | [Y]WO2009029928 (UNIV SOUTH FLORIDA [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,7-13,17,18 * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 37 * * figure 3 *; | [YA]WO2009106733 (TIMOTEO MICHEL [FR], et al) [Y] 9 * page 4, line 38 - page 7, line 2 * * figures 1, 2, 11, 12 * [A] 1,8,10; | [YA]US2009312804 (GAMACHE THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 13 * page 3, paragraph 37 * * figure 4 *[A] 1,8 |