EP2568947 - FILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B. Braun Melsungen AG Carl-Braun-Strasse 1 34212 Melsungen / DE | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITTET, Michel Rout du Châtelard 12 1484 Aumont / CH | 02 /
ANSERMET, Caroline Rue des Cordeires 18BB 1124 Gollion / CH | 03 /
ECABERT, Bastien Chemin de Grandvignes 11 1030 Bussigny / CH | 04 /
BERCHIER, Cédric Chemin des Mélampyres 6 1805 Jogny / CH | [2016/03] |
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
PITTET, Michel Rout du Châtelard 12 CH-1484 Aumont / CH | ||
02 /
ANSERMET, Caroline Rue des Cordeires 18BB CH-1124 Gollion / CH | |||
03 /
ECABERT, Bastien Chemin de Grandvignes 11 CH-1030 Bussigny / CH | |||
04 /
BERCHIER, Cédric Chemin des Mélampyres 6 CH-1805 Jogny / CH | |||
Former [2013/12] | 01 /
PITTET, Michel Rout du Châtelard 12 CH-1484 Aumont / CH | ||
02 /
ANSERMET, Caroline Ch. de la Dranse 11 CH-1004 Lausanne / CH | |||
03 /
ECABERT, Bastien Ch. de la Sauge 7 CH-1030 Bussigny / CH | |||
04 /
BERCHIER, Cédric Route de Chally 268 CH-1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11718037.2 | 02.05.2011 | [2016/03] | WO2011EP56957 | Priority number, date | EP20100162375 | 10.05.2010 Original published format: EP 10162375 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011141315 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2568947 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2568947 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/10 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61J1/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61J1/1475 (EP,US);
B65D31/12 (KR);
B65D75/34 (KR);
A61J1/1462 (EP,US);
A61J1/2024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLUNG | [2013/12] | English: | FILLING | [2013/12] | French: | GARNISSAGE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 27.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.05.2011 | AL | 20.01.2016 | AT | 20.01.2016 | BE | 20.01.2016 | CY | 20.01.2016 | CZ | 20.01.2016 | DK | 20.01.2016 | EE | 20.01.2016 | FI | 20.01.2016 | HR | 20.01.2016 | LT | 20.01.2016 | LV | 20.01.2016 | MC | 20.01.2016 | MK | 20.01.2016 | RO | 20.01.2016 | RS | 20.01.2016 | SI | 20.01.2016 | SK | 20.01.2016 | SM | 20.01.2016 | TR | 20.01.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.04.2016 | GR | 21.04.2016 | IE | 02.05.2016 | LU | 02.05.2016 | IS | 20.05.2016 | PT | 20.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
TR | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.05.2011 | |
AT | 20.01.2016 | ||
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CY | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
MC | 20.01.2016 | ||
MK | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IE | 02.05.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SI | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
LU | 02.05.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
BE | 20.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
CZ | 20.01.2016 | ||
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RO | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
SK | 20.01.2016 | ||
SM | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
EE | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
DK | 20.01.2016 | ||
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
LV | 20.01.2016 | ||
RS | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.05.2016 | ||
PT | 20.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 20.01.2016 | |
FI | 20.01.2016 | ||
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
LT | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 20.01.2016 | |
HR | 20.01.2016 | ||
NO | 20.04.2016 | ||
GR | 21.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6165161 (YORK WALTER A [US], et al); | [A]US2001000042 (INUZUKA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1394071 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2007041408 (ALCON INC [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0295204 | DE9401288U | DE4410876 | DE19605357 | WO9737628 | EP1011605 | WO2007037793 | EP1773277 |