EP2566585 - PRESSURE-RELIEF DEVICE WITH FLAME ARRESTOR FOR A HOUSING ENCLOSED IN A PRESSURE-PROOF MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/11] | PRESSURE-RELIEF DEVICE FOR A HOUSING ENCLOSED IN A PRESSURE-PROOF MANNER | ||
[2022/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE | [2022/15] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74636 Waldenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÜRZ, Helmut Criesbacherstr. 15 74676 Niederhall / DE | 02 /
LIMBACHER, Bernd Hofrain 3 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | 03 /
HERMANN, Wolf Im Möhringer Feld 51 74613 Öhringen / DE | 04 /
HORNIG, Julia Wendezeller Ring 11a 38176 Wendeburg / DE | 05 /
MARKUS, Detlef Lammer Heide 79 38116 Braunschweig / DE | 06 /
KLAUSMEYER, Uwe Oscar-Fehr-Weg 4 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/15] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11718060.4 | 03.05.2011 | [2022/15] | WO2011EP57054 | Priority number, date | DE20101016782 | 04.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010016782 | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011138325 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566585 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566585 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A62C4/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A62C4/00 (EP,US);
A62C3/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKENTLASTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT FLAMMENSPERRE FÜR DRUCKFEST GEKAPSELTE GEHÄUSE | [2019/15] | English: | PRESSURE-RELIEF DEVICE WITH FLAME ARRESTOR FOR A HOUSING ENCLOSED IN A PRESSURE-PROOF MANNER | [2022/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTENTE DE PRESSION AVEC UN PARE-FLAMME POUR UN BOÎTIER ENCAPSULÉ RÉSISTANT À LA PRESSION | [2022/02] |
Former [2013/11] | DRUCKENTLASTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKFEST GEKAPSELTE GEHÄUSE | ||
Former [2013/11] | PRESSURE-RELIEF DEVICE FOR A HOUSING ENCLOSED IN A PRESSURE-PROOF MANNER | ||
Former [2013/11] | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTENTE DE PRESSION POUR UN BOÎTIER ENCAPSULÉ RÉSISTANT À LA PRESSION | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 10.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18211099.9 / EP3482799 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.05.2011 | AL | 13.04.2022 | CY | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | MK | 13.04.2022 | MT | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | TR | 13.04.2022 | AT | 03.05.2022 | IE | 03.05.2022 | LU | 03.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
TR | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 03.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
MK | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 03.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
CY | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 03.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 03.05.2011 | |
AL | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 03.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
AT | 03.05.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
IE | 03.05.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | DK | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
MC | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
LU | 03.05.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | DK | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 13.04.2022 | |
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB778040 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC INT CO); | [XA]CH385741 (IALAG IND ARMATUREN LYSS AG [CH]); | [XDA]US4180177 (ALCOCK KEITH [US], et al); | [XAI]WO2004108219 (LEINEMANN GMBH & CO [DE], et al) | Examination | DE594166 | by applicant | DE1170346 | US4180177 |