24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
04.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
09.06.2017 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
23.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
10.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
04.12.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
04.11.2016 |
Opposition filed |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
24.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
25.12.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] |
30.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.08.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
08.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
02.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
24.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|