EP2566740 - COUPLING FOR RAIL VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR FOR RECOVERING A RAIL VEHICLE WHICH IS INCAPABLE OF MOVING UNDER ITS OWN FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schöneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Rudolf Pappenheimgasse 45/34 A-1200 Wien / AT | 02 /
DEDE, Jani Siegstraße 27 57250 Netphen / DE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2016/04] |
Former [2013/11] | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Park Kolonnaden Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11718085.1 | 05.05.2011 | [2016/04] | WO2011EP57211 | Priority number, date | DE20101019905 | 05.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010019905 | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011138399 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566740 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566740 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B61G7/08, B61D15/06, B61G5/02 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
B61G7/08 (EP);
B61D15/06 (EP);
B61G5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUPPLUNG VON SCHIENENFAHRZEUGEN, INSBESONDERE ZUM BERGEN EINES NICHT AUS EIGENER KRAFT FAHRFÄHIGEN SCHIENENFAHRZEUGS | [2013/11] | English: | COUPLING FOR RAIL VEHICLES, IN PARTICULAR FOR RECOVERING A RAIL VEHICLE WHICH IS INCAPABLE OF MOVING UNDER ITS OWN FORCE | [2013/11] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT DE VÉHICULES FERROVIAIRES, EN PARTICULIER POUR DÉPANNER UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE NE POUVANT PAS SE DÉPLACER DE LUI-MÊME | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 22.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.10.2016
02.11.2016
ADMISSIBLE Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Dr. Weitzel & Partner, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2016/49] | 05.12.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.01.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.03.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2011 | AL | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MT | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | RS | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | GB | 05.05.2016 | IE | 05.05.2016 | LU | 05.05.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | BE | 31.05.2016 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/21] | AL | 27.01.2016 | |
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
GB | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
GB | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
GB | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
GB | 05.05.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE433463 (ZYPEN & CHARLIER G M B H V D) [X] 1,6,8,9 * the whole document * [I] 7,14; | [A]EP1985518 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]WO02096734 (SCHARFENBERGKUPPLUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE4006811 (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE2854776 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE433463 | Opposition | DE433463 | EP1985518 | WO02096734 | DE4006811 | DE2854776 | US7383962 | US3733090 | US3349926 | EP1321344 | US2886188 | US3484000 | EP1982892 |