06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
12.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
06.05.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
04.02.2022 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] |
24.12.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
12.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2021 [2021/49] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
13.08.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
16.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
04.09.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.10.2020 [2020/41] |
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.05.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.07.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2018 |
First examination report |
|
03.04.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
28.04.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
26.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
13.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
11.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
03.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|