10.02.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.11.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.10.2016 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
04.10.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
04.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.06.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.06.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.02.2016 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
22.01.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
18.01.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.11.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.08.2015 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.10.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
26.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
29.08.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
25.07.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] |
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2014 |
First examination report |
|
17.04.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.01.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
07.06.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
25.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
27.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
07.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|