EP2563231 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING CLOSURE OF BODILY OPENINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cook Medical Technologies LLC 750 Daniels Way P.O. Box 2269 Bloomington, IN 47402 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHERWINTER, Danny Azriel 1566 East 21st Street Brooklyn, NY 11210 / US | 02 /
SIGMON, John Crowder 3557-2A Ramsay Street High Point, NC 27265 / US | 03 /
SURTI, Vihar C. 103 Cheswyck Lane Winston-Salem, NC 27104 / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Garratt, Peter Douglas Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11718857.3 | 28.04.2011 | WO2011US34285 | Priority number, date | US20100379243P | 01.09.2010 Original published format: US 379243 P | US20100343435P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 343435 P | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011137224 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563231 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61F2/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00579 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00592 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00597 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00601 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00606 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00615 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00619 (US);
A61B2017/00623 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00637 (US);
A61B2017/00676 (US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00876 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0496 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0072 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG DES VERSCHLUSSES VON KÖRPERÖFFNUNGEN | [2013/10] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FACILITATING CLOSURE OF BODILY OPENINGS | [2013/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FACILITER LA FERMETURE D'OUVERTURES CORPORELLES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 16.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003004579 (ROUSSEAU ROBERT A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,17-20 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 7-9; | [X]US5545178 (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,17 * figures 3-9,13 *; | [Y]US2009062844 (TEKULVE KURT J [US], et al) [Y] 7-9 * figures 2A,2B,3A,3B * * paragraphs [0063] , [0064] *; | [Y]US5397331 (HIMPENS JACQUES [BE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * figures 3-5,10 *; | [Y]US2009204133 (MELZER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 8,9 * paragraph [0031] * | by applicant | US6206931 | US19350613434 | US19430613792 | US20080125525 | US20080191001 |