EP2690984 - TOOTHBRUSH HAVING ORAL CARE FLUID DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYD, Thomas J. 226 High Street Metuchen New Jersey 08840 / US | 02 /
GATZEMEYER, John J. 85 Rohill Road Hillsborough New Jersey 08844 / US | 03 /
KENNEDY, Sharon 4213 Holbrook Road Randallstown Maryland 21133 / US | 04 /
JIMENEZ, Eduardo J. 21 Manor Drive Manalapan New Jersey 07726 / US | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11719385.4 | 28.03.2011 | WO2011US30139 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012134435 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2690984 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2690984 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/00, A46B9/04 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
A46B11/0055 (EP,US);
A46B11/0082 (EP,KR,US);
A46B11/001 (KR,US);
A46B11/0037 (US);
A46B11/06 (KR);
A46B9/04 (US);
A61C15/02 (US);
A61C15/046 (US);
A61C17/227 (US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/06] | A46B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT FLÜSSIGKEITABGABESYSTEM ZUR MUNDPFLEGE | [2014/46] | English: | TOOTHBRUSH HAVING ORAL CARE FLUID DELIVERY | [2014/06] | French: | BROSSE À DENTS AVEC DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE D'HYGIÈNE BUCCODENTAIRE | [2014/46] |
Former [2014/06] | ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT MUNDPFLEGEFLÜSSIGKEITSABGABE | ||
Former [2014/06] | BROSSE À DENTS AYANT UNE DISTRIBUTION DE FLUIDE D'HYGIÈNE BUCCALE | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 12.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14190215.5 / EP2848156 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | AT | 06.05.2015 | BE | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.03.2011 | |
AT | 06.05.2015 | ||
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
BE | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1470268 (TRISA BUERSTENFABRIK AG) [A] 1,20,37 * page 2 - page 3; figure - *; | [A]DE9007098U (SAALFELD HERGEN) [A] 1,20,37 * page 4 - page 6; figure - *; | [A]WO2007073917 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1,20,37 * page 9; figure - *; | [A]US2011041275 (GATZEMEYER JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,20,37 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0 33]; figure - *; | [E]WO2011106017 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [E] 1,20,37* the whole document * | by applicant | US7143462 |