EP2675758 - AN IMPROVED ELECTROCHEMICAL COAGULATION PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF NITRATE FROM DRINKING WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | For all designated states Université de Poitiers 15 Rue de l'Hôtel Dieu 86034 Poitiers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université De Poitiers 15 Rue de l'Hôtel Dieu 86034 Poitiers Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2013/52] | For all designated states Council of Scientific & Industrial Research Anusandhan Bhawan Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
For all designated states Université De Poitiers 15 Rue de l'Hôtel Dieu 86034 Poitiers Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBRAMANYAN, Vasudevan Electroinorganic Chemicals Division CECRI 630 006 Karaikudi Tamil Nadu / IN | 02 /
EPRON, Florence Université de Poitiers Laboratoire de Catalyse en Chimie Organique Batiment de Chimie 40 avenue du recteur Pineau 86022 Poitiers / FR | 03 /
SUBBIAH, Ravichandran Electroinorganic Chemicals Division CECRI 630 006 Karaikudi Tamil Nadu / IN | 04 /
GANAPATHY, Sozhan Electroinorganic Chemicals Division CECRI 630 006 Karaikudi Tamil Nadu / IN | 05 /
SWAMINATHAN, Mohan Electroinorganic Chemicals Division CECRI 630 006 Karaikudi Tamil Nadu / IN | 06 /
JOTHINATHAN, Lakshmi Electroinorganic Chemicals Division CECRI 630 006 Karaikudi Tamil Nadu / IN | [2013/52] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [2017/52] |
Former [2013/52] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11719641.0 | 31.03.2011 | [2017/52] | WO2011IB00701 | Priority number, date | IN2011DEL372 | 14.02.2011 Original published format: IN 372DE2011 | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/52] | IN2011DEL0372 | 14.02.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012110841 | Date: | 23.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2675758 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2675758 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/463, C02F1/461, C02F101/16 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
C02F1/463 (EP);
C02F1/46109 (EP);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F2001/46133 (EP);
C02F2001/46152 (EP);
C02F2101/163 (EP);
C02F2201/4614 (EP);
C02F2201/46145 (EP);
C02F2209/001 (EP);
C02F2209/003 (EP);
C02F2209/02 (EP);
C02F2209/06 (EP);
C02F9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES ELEKTROCHEMISCHES KOAGULATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON NITRAT AUS TRINKWASSER | [2013/52] | English: | AN IMPROVED ELECTROCHEMICAL COAGULATION PROCESS FOR THE REMOVAL OF NITRATE FROM DRINKING WATER | [2013/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COAGULATION ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE AMÉLIORÉ POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DES NITRATES DE L'EAU POTABLE | [2013/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/52] | 01.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2011 | AL | 27.12.2017 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | IT | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | NL | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | TR | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | IE | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | LU | 31.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 31.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 31.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 31.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
TR | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
IT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
NL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1995221 (SIMA 11 S L [ES]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0051] , [0052] , [0054]; example 5; claims 1,8,13,14 *; | [X]US2010051542 (ELEKTOROWICZ MARIA [CA], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0003] , [0174] - [0179] - [0189] , [0262]; figure 5 *; | [X]WO2010115904 (ENVITECH S R L SA [IT], et al) [X] 1,4 * examples 3,6 *; | [X]CN2504260Y (FAN GUOFANG [CN]) [X] 1 * abstract * | [XI] - KUMAR N S ET AL, "Factors influencing arsenic and nitrate removal from drinking water in a continuous flow electrocoagulation (EC) process", JOURNAL OF HAZARDOUS MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 173, no. 1-3, doi:10.1016/J.JHAZMAT.2009.08.117, ISSN 0304-3894, (20100115), pages 528 - 533, (20090902), XP026782494 [X] 1,3,4,6 * page 528, column 1 * * page 529; figure 1 * * page 530, column 1, paragraph 2.1.1; table 1 * * page 530, column 2, paragraph 3.1.1 * * page 532, column 2, paragraph 4 * [I] 2,5,7-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhazmat.2009.08.117 | [X] - FAN GUOFANG, "Water purifier", EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, (20020807), Database accession no. CN-01264802-U, XP002660365 [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US4956057 | US5614078 | US5935392 | US5376240 | US5306400 |