Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] |
27.11.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.05.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.07.2013 | Change - extension states | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
12.04.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
01.02.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
04.01.2013 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.11.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication |