Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8624469 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2014 | B2 | US2013200753 | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | US201113643649 | 22.04.2011 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130022408 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013527702 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102971088 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2563527 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2797685 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 | WO2011US33579 | 22.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011139602 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011139602 | 10.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32925810 | 29.04.2010 |