EP2707810 - TECHNIQUE FOR SYNCHRONIZED CONTENT SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital CE Patent Holdings 3 rue du Colonel Moll 75017 Paris / FR | [2019/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BICAKCI, Oner 33155 Falcon Drive Fremont, California 94555 / US | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Interdigital Immeuble ZEN 2 845 A, avenue des Champs Blancs 35510 Cesson-Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11721611.9 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US35828 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012154169 | Date: | 15.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2707810 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,KR,US);
G06F16/176 (KR);
G06F16/447 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/1095 (CN,KR,US);
G06F16/1734 (KR);
G06F16/178 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR SYNCHRONISIERTE GEMEINSAME INHALTSNUTZUNG | [2014/12] | English: | TECHNIQUE FOR SYNCHRONIZED CONTENT SHARING | [2014/12] | French: | TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT UN PARTAGE DE CONTENU SYNCHRONISÉ | [2014/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 22.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.07.2021 | 21.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/40] | 31.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/40] | 13.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1681639 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 14 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] *; | [X]US2006220986 (TAKABE MASAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 2,7,8 ** paragraphs [0060] - [0064] * |