EP2583335 - LITHIUM-ION BATTERY WITH AMORPHOUS ELECTRODE MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Li-Tec Battery GmbH Am Wiesengrund 7 01917 Kamenz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Li-tec Battery GmbH Am Wiesengrund 7 01917 Kamenz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Tim Am Sportplatz 15 99768 Harztor / DE | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Brückner, Ingo Andreas, et al Daimler AG Intellectual Property & Technology Management RD/RI- H512 70546 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Wallinger, Michael Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11721717.4 | 17.05.2011 | WO2011EP02450 | Priority number, date | DE20101024479 | 21.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010024479 | [2013/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011160747 | Date: | 29.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2583335 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/58, H01M10/0525, H01M4/505, H01M4/525 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M50/44 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/5805 (EP,US);
H01M4/581 (EP,US);
H01M4/5815 (EP,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H01M50/414 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
H01M50/494 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (US);
Y02T10/70 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIE MIT AMORPHEN ELEKTRODENMATERIALIEN | [2013/17] | English: | LITHIUM-ION BATTERY WITH AMORPHOUS ELECTRODE MATERIALS | [2013/17] | French: | BATTERIE AUX IONS LITHIUM COMPRENANT DES MATIÈRES D'ÉLECTRODE AMORPHES | [2013/17] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 22.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003224249 (GORCHKOV V S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,14,15 * abstract ** page 8; claims 1, 2, 3, 7 *; | [XI]EP2157639 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,14,15 * paragraph [0257]; example 19 * [I] 8,11,13 | by applicant | WO9959218 | WO2004021477 | WO2004021499 | EP1017476 | - KANG, B., CEDER, G., "Battery materials for ultrafast charging and discharging", NATURE, (20090312), vol. 458, doi:doi:10.1038/nature07853, pages 190 - 193, XP055035607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature07853 | - MATERIAL SCIENCE-POLAND, (2009), vol. 27, no. 1 |