EP2710457 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DIGITAL SCENE DESCRIPTION DATA AND TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER SCENE PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dream Chip Technologies GmbH Steinriede 10 30827 Garbsen / DE | [2014/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEINKE, Bernd Am Grünewald 16 58507 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Lins, Martina, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Lins, Martina, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Theodor-Heuss-Strasse1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 11722324.8 | 20.05.2011 | WO2011EP02525 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012159640 | Date: | 29.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2710457 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, H04N7/26 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/14 (EP,US);
G06T13/80 (US);
G06T13/00 (EP,US);
G06T9/001 (EP,US);
H04N21/23412 (EP,US);
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
G06F3/1454 (EP,US);
G09G2340/02 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2350/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON BESCHREIBUNGSDATEN DIGITALER SZENEN SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON SENDER- UND EMPFÄNGERSZENEN | [2014/13] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING DIGITAL SCENE DESCRIPTION DATA AND TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER SCENE PROCESSING DEVICE | [2014/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES DE DESCRIPTION DE SCÈNE NUMÉRIQUES ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SCÈNE ÉMETTEUR ET RÉCEPTEUR | [2014/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2013 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 04.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1293887 (SILICON GRAPHICS INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041] - [0 44] , [0 47] , [0 58] - [0060] - [0 74] - [0076]; figures 2, 4 *; | [AD]WO2009040313 (IBM [US], et al) [AD] 1,10* the whole document *; | [X]US2011078532 (VONOG STANISLAV [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * paragraphs [0048] , [0 53] , [0 62] , [0 69] , [0 73] - [0086]; figures 1-5, 8 * * paragraphs [0094] - [0101] - [ 111] - [0120] - [ 159] - [0169] * * paragraphs [0251] - [0252] * | by applicant | US2007153004 | WO2009040313 |