24.05.2019 |
Refusal of application |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
13.04.2019 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.09.2018 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.09.2018 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
02.05.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2017 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
04.09.2017 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
21.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
21.05.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
02.05.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.10.2015 |
First examination report |
|
25.09.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.04.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2015 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
20.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] |
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.01.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
03.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] |
15.03.2013 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
15.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
15.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
22.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|