Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5924740B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2016 | B2 | JP2013527529 | 27.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US78062110 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US32459 | 14.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011253405B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | B2 | AU2011253405 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78062110 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US32459 | 14.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2569697 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | A4 | EP2569697 | 20.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78062110 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US32459 | 14.04.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011142933 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2013 | A3 | WO2011142933 | 17.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US78062110 | 14.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9064222 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2015 | B2 | US2011283285 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78062110 | 14.05.2010 |