EP2577813 - DUAL ORIENTATION CONNECTOR WITH EXTERNAL CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop, MS 169-3IPL Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOLKO, Albert J 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1DR Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Mathias 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1DR Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 03 /
SPRAGGS, Ian 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1PH Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 04 /
FRAZIER, Cameron 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1PH Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
JOL, Eric 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1PH Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 06 /
MINOO, Jahan 1 Infinite Loop, MS 81-2PT Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 07 /
ROTHKOPF, Fletcher 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1PH Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
AASE, Jonathan 1 Infinite Loop, MS 305-1DR Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 09 /
SANDER, Wendell B. 1 Infinite Loop, MS 3169-3IPL Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 10 /
TERLIZZI, Jeffrey J. 1 Infinite Loop, MS 81-2PT Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2020/04] |
Former [2013/15] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11723214.0 | 27.05.2011 | [2020/04] | WO2011US38452 | Priority number, date | US201161436545P | 26.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161436545 P | US201161436490P | 26.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161436490 P | US20100407363P | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 407363 P | US20100356499P | 18.06.2010 Original published format: US 356499 P | US20100353126P | 09.06.2010 Original published format: US 353126 P | US20100349737P | 28.05.2010 Original published format: US 349737 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011150403 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577813 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577813 | Date: | 22.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R29/00, H01R13/648, H01R13/516, H01R13/627, H01R13/642, H01R13/631, H01R12/77, H01R4/01, H01R13/504 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
H01R13/6273 (EP,US);
H01R29/00 (EP,KR,US);
H01R13/516 (EP,US);
H01R13/58 (US);
H01R13/62 (US);
H01R13/627 (KR);
H01R13/642 (EP,US);
H01R13/648 (KR);
H01R13/6485 (EP,US);
H01R13/658 (US);
H01R24/58 (KR,US);
H01R24/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKER MIT ZWEIFACHER AUSRICHTUNG MIT EXTERNEN KONTAKTEN | [2013/15] | English: | DUAL ORIENTATION CONNECTOR WITH EXTERNAL CONTACTS | [2013/15] | French: | CONNECTEUR À DOUBLE ORIENTATION À CONTACTS EXTERNES | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 01.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2013 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 18.11.2013 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 04.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14152776.2 / EP2728680 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2011 | AL | 22.01.2020 | AT | 22.01.2020 | CY | 22.01.2020 | CZ | 22.01.2020 | DK | 22.01.2020 | EE | 22.01.2020 | ES | 22.01.2020 | FI | 22.01.2020 | HR | 22.01.2020 | IT | 22.01.2020 | LT | 22.01.2020 | LV | 22.01.2020 | MC | 22.01.2020 | MK | 22.01.2020 | MT | 22.01.2020 | PL | 22.01.2020 | RO | 22.01.2020 | RS | 22.01.2020 | SE | 22.01.2020 | SI | 22.01.2020 | SK | 22.01.2020 | SM | 22.01.2020 | TR | 22.01.2020 | BG | 22.04.2020 | NO | 22.04.2020 | GR | 23.04.2020 | IS | 22.05.2020 | GB | 27.05.2020 | IE | 27.05.2020 | LU | 27.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | PT | 14.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.01.2020 | ||
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
GB | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.05.2011 | |
AT | 22.01.2020 | ||
CY | 22.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
MT | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
GB | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
TR | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
GB | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
GB | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
GB | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
IE | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
LU | 27.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 22.01.2020 | |
CZ | 22.01.2020 | ||
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
IT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
MC | 22.01.2020 | ||
PL | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SI | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
EE | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 22.01.2020 | |
DK | 22.01.2020 | ||
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SK | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RO | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
SM | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 22.01.2020 | |
ES | 22.01.2020 | ||
FI | 22.01.2020 | ||
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LT | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
IS | 22.05.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
BG | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
GR | 23.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
HR | 22.01.2020 | ||
LV | 22.01.2020 | ||
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
SE | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
RS | 22.01.2020 | ||
NO | 22.04.2020 | ||
PT | 14.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 22.01.2020 | |
NO | 22.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2138961 (AMP INC) [A] 39-41,44 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0081372 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) [A] 65* page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 15 *; | [YA]US4621882 (KRUMME JOHN F [US]) [Y] 65 * figures 1-5,10 * * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 52 * [A] 78; | [A]US4711506 (TANAKA MASANORI [JP]) [A] 49 * figure 2 *; | [IY]US5256074 (TAN HAW-CHAN [US], et al) [I] 45,47,48 * figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,14,15,17-19,22,34,49; | [XY]US5442243 (BAILEY HENRY C [US]) [X] 1,39-41,44,77 * figure 1 * [Y] 42,43; | [A]US6074225 (WU KUN-TSAN [TW], et al) [A] 49 * figure 5 *; | [A]US6179627 (DALY JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * figure 4 *; | [A]JP2003217728 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * figures 5,6 *; | [XI]WO2005013436 (MDRM INC [US], et al) [X] 58,60,62,63,67-69,72 * figures 11,12a-13c * * page 6, lines 3-10 * [I] 70,71; | [Y]US6981887 (MESE JOHN C [US], et al) [Y] 42 * figure 6 *; | [XYI]WO2006013553 (MILSYS LTD [IL], et al) [X] 58-63,67-69,72 * abstract * * page 13, line 6 - page 14, line 5 * [Y] 65 [I] 70,71; | [XYI]US2007243726 (TRENNE RODNEY J [US]) [X] 1,2,16,23,77 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 9-15 * [Y] 3,4,14,15,17-19,22,25-27,34-36,53,73 [I] 8-13,20,21,28-33,79; | [Y]US2009117768 (LIAO SHENG-HSIN [TW]) [Y] 49 * figure 5 *; | [Y]WO2009069969 (LEE MOON KEY [KR]) [Y] 43,73-76 * figures 6,7 *; | [XAYI]US2009156027 (CHEN WAN-TIEN [TW]) [X] 45,46,50 * figure 1 * [A] 6 [Y] 53 [I] 51,52; | [Y]US2009180243 (LYNCH STEPHEN BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 25-27,35,36,74-76 * figure 1 * |