12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
08.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] |
21.08.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
12.09.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
09.09.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.09.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.09.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.06.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.07.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
29.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
22.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] |
12.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.11.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|