EP2571433 - ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION WITH IMAGERY ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synthes GmbH Eimattstrasse 3 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKONOVAS, Arkadijus 36 Bridgeness Road Littleover Derby DE23 3US / GB | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2016/25] |
Former [2013/13] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11723796.6 | 19.05.2011 | [2016/25] | WO2011US37128 | Priority number, date | GB20100008281 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: GB 201008281 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011146703 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2571433 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2571433 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/62, A61B17/66, A61B90/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
A61B34/10 (EP,US);
A61B17/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/66 (EP,KR,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16Z99/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | A61B17/62, A61B17/66, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTHOPÄDISCHE FIXIERUNG MIT BILDANALYSE | [2013/13] | English: | ORTHOPEDIC FIXATION WITH IMAGERY ANALYSIS | [2013/13] | French: | FIXATION ORTHOPÉDIQUE DOTÉE D'UNE ANALYSE DES IMAGES | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 31.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16165349.8 / EP3069673 | EP18207561.4 / EP3474284 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2011 | AL | 22.06.2016 | AT | 22.06.2016 | BE | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | CZ | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | NL | 22.06.2016 | PL | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SE | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SK | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | TR | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.05.2011 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 22.06.2016 | |
AT | 22.06.2016 | ||
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 22.06.2016 | |
BE | 22.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 22.06.2016 | |
CZ | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
PL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
SK | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
NL | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SE | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002010465 (KOO JA KYO [KR], et al); | [X]US2004097922 (MULLANEY MICHAEL W [US]) | Examination | US2005256389 | by applicant | GB1008281 |