EP2575700 - DEVICE SYSTEM FOR GASTRIC VOLUME REDUCTION TO FACILITATE WEIGHT LOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Michigan Office of Technology Transfer 1214 S. University Avenue, 2nd Floor Ann Arbor, MI 48104-2592 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORAL, Elif, Arioglu 1754 High Pointe Lane Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US | 02 /
ORAL, Hakan 1754 High Pointe Lane Ann Arbor MI 48108 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2013/15] | Witte, Weller & Partner Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11723841.0 | 26.05.2011 | WO2011US38080 | Priority number, date | US20100348801P | 27.05.2010 Original published format: US 348801 P | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011150169 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575700 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2575700 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, A61M29/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
A61F5/0036 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (US);
A61F5/004 (EP,US);
A61F5/0046 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄTESYSTEM ZUR MAGENVOLUMENREDUKTION FÜR LEICHTEREN GEWICHTSVERLUST | [2013/15] | English: | DEVICE SYSTEM FOR GASTRIC VOLUME REDUCTION TO FACILITATE WEIGHT LOSS | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA RÉDUCTION DU VOLUME GASTRIQUE AFIN DE FACILITER LA PERTE DE POIDS | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 02.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2011 | AL | 05.08.2015 | AT | 05.08.2015 | BE | 05.08.2015 | BG | 05.08.2015 | CY | 05.08.2015 | CZ | 05.08.2015 | DK | 05.08.2015 | EE | 05.08.2015 | ES | 05.08.2015 | FI | 05.08.2015 | HR | 05.08.2015 | IT | 05.08.2015 | LT | 05.08.2015 | LV | 05.08.2015 | MC | 05.08.2015 | MK | 05.08.2015 | NL | 05.08.2015 | PL | 05.08.2015 | RO | 05.08.2015 | RS | 05.08.2015 | SE | 05.08.2015 | SI | 05.08.2015 | SK | 05.08.2015 | SM | 05.08.2015 | TR | 05.08.2015 | NO | 05.11.2015 | GR | 06.11.2015 | IS | 05.12.2015 | PT | 07.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 26.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
BG | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
TR | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.05.2011 | |
AT | 05.08.2015 | ||
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CY | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
MC | 05.08.2015 | ||
MK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
SM | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
BE | 05.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SI | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RO | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
SK | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
CZ | 05.08.2015 | ||
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
EE | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
IT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
DK | 05.08.2015 | ||
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NL | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 05.08.2015 | |
ES | 05.08.2015 | ||
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 05.08.2015 | |
FI | 05.08.2015 | ||
HR | 05.08.2015 | ||
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
PL | 05.08.2015 | ||
RS | 05.08.2015 | ||
SE | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
IS | 05.12.2015 | ||
PT | 07.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 05.08.2015 | |
LT | 05.08.2015 | ||
LV | 05.08.2015 | ||
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
GR | 06.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 05.08.2015 | |
NO | 05.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 05.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006020929 (PHAGIA TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12,16,19 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032] ** paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]WO2007113714 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-10,12-20 * page 4, line 7 - page 6, line 23; figures 1,2 * [I] 11 |