12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
07.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
17.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
23.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] |
16.12.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
08.01.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] |
07.12.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.12.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
20.09.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.08.2015 |
Change - English title |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
21.08.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
03.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.07.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
07.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.03.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.04.2013 [2013/15] |
15.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
15.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|