EP2454080 - IMPROVED STEREOLITHOGRAPHY MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DWS S.R.L. Via Lago di Levico 3 36010 Zane' (VI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Dws S.R.L. Via Lago di Levico 3 36010 Zane' (VI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUSATO, Renzo Via Pietro Berto 8/D I-36035 Marano Vicentino (VI) / IT | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Bonini, Ercole Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 11724143.0 | 16.05.2011 | WO2011EP57904 | Priority number, date | IT2010VI00136 | 17.05.2010 Original published format: IT VI20100136 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011144580 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454080 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454080 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
B29C64/135 (EP,US);
B29C67/00 (KR);
B29C64/232 (EP,US);
B29C64/245 (EP,US);
B29C64/25 (EP,US);
B29C64/255 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | 26.01.2012 | ME | 26.01.2012 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE STEREOLITHOGRAPHIEMASCHINE | [2012/21] | English: | IMPROVED STEREOLITHOGRAPHY MACHINE | [2012/21] | French: | MACHINE DE STÉRÉOLITHOGRAPHIE AMÉLIORÉE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 10.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2011 | AL | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | RS | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | IE | 16.05.2014 | LU | 16.05.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MK | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.05.2011 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
IE | 16.05.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 16.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | HR | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | HR | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
RS | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | HR | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0379068 (MITSUI SHIPBUILDING ENG [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 12 * * page 4, line 24 - line 32 * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 36 ** figure 5 * | by applicant | EP0379068 |