12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
18.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
08.05.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
06.02.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
28.02.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.02.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.02.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
25.10.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
23.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
15.02.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
07.01.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|