Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013014242 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113634987 | 13.05.2011 | US33498310 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US36489 | 13.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2799347 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | C | CA2799347 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33498310 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US36489 | 13.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2569909 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2014 | B1 | EP2569909 | 20.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33498310 | 14.05.2010 | WO2011US36489 | 13.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011143591 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33498310 | 14.05.2010 |